EP3781493 - VENTED SPOUT FOR A LIQUID STORAGE CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 25.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE GROUPE DSD INC. 2515 ch. de l'Aéroport Thetford Mines, QC G6G 5R7 / CA | [2021/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VACHON, Léandre 2045 chemin de l'Aéroport Thetford Mines Québec G6G 5R7 / CA | [2021/08] | Representative(s) | RPK Patenanwälte Reinhardt und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB (Pforzheim) Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/08] | RPK Patentanwälte Reinhardt, Pohlmann und Kaufmann Partnerschaft mbB Grünstraße 1 75172 Pforzheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 19789139.3 | 16.04.2019 | [2021/08] | WO2019CA50468 | Priority number, date | CA20183001597 | 16.04.2018 Original published format: CA 3001597 | [2021/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019200469 | Date: | 24.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3781493 | Date: | 24.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3781493 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 24.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B67D7/00, B67D7/02, B67D7/04, B65D47/06, B65D51/16, B65D25/48 | [2021/27] | CPC: |
B67D7/02 (EP);
B65D47/32 (US);
B65D47/12 (US);
B65D50/06 (EP,US);
B67D3/044 (EP);
B67D3/046 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/08] | B65D47/06, B65D51/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BELÜFTETER AUSGUSS FÜR EINEN FLÜSSIGKEITSVORRATSBEHÄLTER | [2021/08] | English: | VENTED SPOUT FOR A LIQUID STORAGE CONTAINER | [2021/08] | French: | BEC VERSEUR AÉRÉ POUR UN RÉCIPIENT DE STOCKAGE DE LIQUIDE | [2021/08] | Entry into regional phase | 11.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 11.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.02.2020 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: CA | 11.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/08] | 03.01.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 12.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0585393 (VEMCO INC [US]); | [Y]US6478058 (PEARS MICHAEL [CA]); | [Y]US7013936 (SCHLIEMANN HARALD [DE], et al); | [YA]EP3067312 (STAUDE WOLFGANG [DE]); | [Y]US9493280 (WILKINSON WILLIAM R [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6435380 (RABOIN RONALD K [US]); | [A]US8403185 (VACHON LEANDRE [CA]); | [XY]US9493280 (WILKINSON WILLIAM R [US], et al); | [A]US2018037379 (ADAM ROLAND [DE], et al) | Examination | US2014021222 | by applicant | US8403185 | US8561858 |