EP3864018 - SOLID FORMS OF N-(4-FLUORO-3-(6-(3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)-[1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-2-YL)PHENYL)-2,4-DIMETHYLOXAZOLE-5-CARBOXAMIDE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.02.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.02.2024 | Change - inventor | published on 06.03.2024 [2024/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Novartis AG Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CAO, Yudong 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Siyi 4218 Jinke Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
KIM, Hongyong No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | 04 /
KORDIKOWSKI, Andreas Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | 05 /
XIA, Mei 4218 Jinke Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
YU, Bo No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | 07 /
ZHANG, Jing No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | 08 /
ZHAO, Yi 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | [2024/10] |
Former [2021/33] | 01 /
CAO, Yudong 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | ||
02 /
JIANG, Siyi 4218 Jinke Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
03 /
KIM, Hongyong No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | |||
04 /
KORDIKOWSKI, Andreas Postfach 4002 Basel / CH | |||
05 /
XIA, Irene 4218 Jinke Road ZhangJiang Hi-Tech Park, Pudong District Shanghai 201203 / CN | |||
06 /
YU, Bo No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | |||
07 /
ZHANG, Jing No. 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | |||
08 /
ZHAO, Yi 18 Tonglian Road Riverside Industrial Park Changshu Economic Development Zone Changshu, Jiangsu 215537 / CN | Representative(s) | Ridout, Joseph Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department Lichtstrasse 35 4056 Basel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Larbig, Karen Dorothee, et al Novartis Pharma AG Patent Department 4002 Basel / CH | Application number, filing date | 19789751.5 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019IB58535 | Priority number, date | WO2018CN109415 | 09.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/CN2018/109415 | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020075046 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3864018 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, C07C57/15, A61P33/02, A61K31/519, A61K45/06 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/519 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K45/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0053 (EP,IL,KR);
A61P33/02 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07C57/15 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | FESTE FORMEN VON N-(4-FLUOR-3-(6-(3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)-[1,2,4]-TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-2-YL)PHENYL)-2,4-DIMETHYLOXAZOL-5-CARBOXAMID | [2021/33] | English: | SOLID FORMS OF N-(4-FLUORO-3-(6-(3-METHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)-[1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-2-YL)PHENYL)-2,4-DIMETHYLOXAZOLE-5-CARBOXAMIDE | [2021/33] | French: | FORMES SOLIDES DE N-(4-FLUORO-3-(6-(3-MÉTHYLPYRIDIN-2-YL)-[1,2,4]TRIAZOLO[1,5-A]PYRIMIDIN-2-YL)PHÉNYL)-2,4-DIMÉTHYLOXAZOLE-5-CARBOXAMIDE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 10.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 10.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.04.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 10.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 13.04.2022 | Invitation to indicate the basis for amendments (Time limit: M01) | 21.04.2022 | Reply to an invitation to indicate the basis for amendments | 30.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2004078163 (TRANSFORM PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | [Y]WO2007092779 (REDDYS LAB LTD DR [IN], et al); | [YD]WO2015095477 (IRM LLC [US], et al); | by applicant | WO2015095477 |