EP3858095 - RESOURCE MANAGEMENT, ACCESS CONTROL AND MOBILITY FOR GRANT-FREE UPLINK TRANSMISSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 28.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENGUPTA, Ayan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
PHUYAL, Umesh 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 03 /
RICO ALVARINO, Alberto 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | 04 /
LIU, Le 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19789809.1 | 26.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019US53116 | Priority number, date | US201862737101P | 26.09.2018 Original published format: US 201862737101 P | US201916582995 | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US201916582995 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020069099 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858095 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04W76/27, H04W36/00, H04W36/14, H04W72/04 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
H04W76/27 (EP,US);
H04W76/36 (US);
H04J13/0062 (EP,US);
H04L5/0044 (EP);
H04L5/0051 (US);
H04L5/10 (US);
H04W68/005 (US);
H04W68/02 (US);
H04W72/0446 (US);
H04W72/21 (US);
H04W72/23 (EP,US);
H04W72/51 (US);
H04W74/02 (US);
H04W74/08 (US);
H04W76/30 (US);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04W36/0055 (EP,US);
H04W36/08 (EP);
H04W36/14 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | RESSOURCENVERWALTUNG, ZUGANGSSTEUERUNG UND MOBILITÄT FÜR BERECHTIGUNGSFREIE UPLINK-ÜBERTRAGUNG | [2021/31] | English: | RESOURCE MANAGEMENT, ACCESS CONTROL AND MOBILITY FOR GRANT-FREE UPLINK TRANSMISSION | [2021/31] | French: | GESTION DE RESSOURCES, CONTRÔLE D'ACCÈS ET MOBILITÉ POUR TRANSMISSION EN LIAISON MONTANTE SANS OCTROI | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 25.02.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |