EP3856156 - 5-HT7 ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMENTIA-ASSOCIATED TAUOPATHIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Medizinische Hochschule Hannover (MHH) Carl-Neuberg-Strasse 1 30625 Hannover / DE | For all designated states Deutsches Zentrum für Neurodegenerative Erkrankungen e.V. (DZNE) Venusberg-Campus 1, Gebäude 99 53127 Bonn / DE | [2021/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONIMASKIN, Evgeni Am Friedenstal 11A 30627 Hannover / DE | 02 /
ROEHRS, Kian-Fritz Drei Eichen 19 27283 Verden/Aller / DE | 03 /
BUTZLAFF, Malte Benrode 2 31311 Uetze / DE | 04 /
LABUS, Josephine Stadtstraße 2 30159 Hannover / DE | 05 /
DITYATEV, Alexander Bahnhofstrasse 37 39175 Wahlitz / DE | 06 /
VARBANOV, Hristo Alfred-Delp-Str. 148 55122 Mainz / DE | 07 /
JIA, Shaobo Leibniz Strasse 25 Raum 16 39104 Magdeburg / DE | 08 /
SUN, Weilun Walther-Rathenau-Str.58/503 39104 Magdeburg / DE | [2023/16] |
Former [2021/31] | 01 /
PONIMASKIN, Evgeni Am Friedenstal 11A 30627 Hannover / DE | ||
02 /
ROEHRS, Kian-Fritz Drei Eichen 19 27283 Verden/Aller / DE | |||
03 /
BUTZLAFF, Malte Benrode 2 31311 Uetze / DE | |||
04 /
LABUS, Josephine Stadtstraße 2 30159 Hannover / DE | |||
05 /
DITYATEV, Alexander Bahnhofstrasse 37 39175 Wahlitz / DE | |||
06 /
VARBANOV, Hristo Alfred-Delp-Str. 148 55122 Mainz / DE | |||
07 /
JIA, Shaobo Leibniz Strasse 25 Raum 16 39104 Magdeburg / DE | |||
08 /
WEILUN, Sun Walther-Rathenau-Str.58/503 39104 Magdeburg / DE | Representative(s) | Schiweck Weinzierl Koch Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Ganghoferstraße 68 B 80339 München / DE | [2021/31] | Application number, filing date | 19790145.7 | 30.09.2019 | [2021/31] | WO2019EP76397 | Priority number, date | EP20180197401 | 28.09.2018 Original published format: EP 18197401 | [2021/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020065090 | Date: | 02.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/14] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3856156 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/00, A61K31/40, A61K31/454, A61K31/495, A61K31/496, A61K31/55, A61K31/551, A61P25/16, A61P25/28 | [2021/31] | CPC: |
A61K31/495 (EP,US);
A61K31/40 (EP,US);
A61K31/00 (EP);
A61K31/166 (US);
A61K31/454 (EP,US);
A61K31/496 (EP,US);
A61K31/55 (EP,US);
A61K31/551 (EP);
A61K31/5513 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | 5-HT7-ANTAGONIST ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MIT DEMENZ ASSOZIIERTEN TAUOPATHIEN | [2021/31] | English: | 5-HT7 ANTAGONIST FOR THE TREATMENT OF DEMENTIA-ASSOCIATED TAUOPATHIES | [2021/31] | French: | TRAITEMENT DE TAUOPATHIES ASSOCIÉES À UNE DÉMENCE | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 28.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.09.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO0037082 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [A] 1-9 * abstract *; | [X]WO02062788 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,5-9 * abstract * * page 1, line 1 - line 5 * * page 8, line 40 - page 9, line 13 * * examples 1,18; claim -; tables 1,2 *; | [X]WO2013038200 (UNIV SUSSEX [GB], et al) [X] 1-9 * page 10, line 4 - line 18 * * claims 17,22,24 *; | [X] - GASBARRI A ET AL, "Effect of 5-HT"7 antagonist SB-269970 in the modulation of working and reference memory in the rat", BEHAVIOURAL BRAIN RESEARCH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, vol. 195, no. 1, doi:10.1016/J.BBR.2007.12.020, ISSN 0166-4328, (20081216), pages 164 - 170, (20080109), XP025471553 [X] 1-9 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbr.2007.12.020 | [X] - ALEXANDRE V. IVACHTCHENKO ET AL, "AVN-101: A Multi-Target Drug Candidate for the Treatment of CNS Disorders", JOURNAL OF ALZHEIMER'S DISEASE, NL, (20160713), vol. 53, no. 2, doi:10.3233/JAD-151146, ISSN 1387-2877, pages 583 - 620, XP055568533 [X] 1,8,9 * abstract * * page 583, column l, paragraph l - page 584, column r, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3233/JAD-151146 | [A] - MALTE BUTZLAFF ET AL., "The Role of Serotonin Receptors in Alzheimer's Disease", OPERA MEDICA ET PHYSIOLOGICA, (201601), vol. 2, no. 1, pages 77 - 86, XP002789898 [A] 1-9 * the whole document * | [XP] - Kathrin Jahreis, Josephine Labus, Evgeni Ponimaskin, "The role of 5-HT7-receptor signalling in neurodegenerativediseases", (201903), page T11-12B, Göttingen Meeting of the German Neuroscience Society 2019, URL: https://www.nwg-goettingen.de/2019/upload/file/Proceedings-NWG-2019.pdf, (20190320), XP002789899 [XP] 1,7-9 * the whole document * | by applicant | - ARENDT et al., Brain Res. Bull., (20160000), vol. 126, pages 238 - 292 | - JOSEPHS, Mayo Clin. Proc., (20170000), vol. 92, pages 1291 - 1303 | - WANGMANDELKOW, Nat. Rev. Neurosci., (20150000), vol. 17, pages 22 - 35 | - BUEE et al., Brain Res Brain Res Rev, (20000000), vol. 33, pages 95 - 130 | - STRAC et al., Transl Neurosci., (20160000), vol. 7, no. 1, pages 35 - 492 | - GOEDERT et al., The Neuroscientist., (19970000), vol. 3, pages 131 - 141 | - BRAAKBRAAK, Acta Neuropathologica, (19910000), vol. 82, pages 239 - 259 | - ARRIAGADA et al., Neurology, (19920000), vol. 42, no. 3, page 631 | - MAHE et al., Eur J Pharmacol, (20040000), vol. 495, no. 2-3, pages 97 - 102 | - THOMAS et al., British Journal of Pharmacology, (19980000), vol. 124, pages 1300 - 1306 | - STREJAN et al., J. Neuroimmunol., (19840000), vol. 7, page 27 | - HEDLUND et al., Trends Pharmacol. Sci., (20030000), vol. 25, pages 481 - 486 | - SPERANZA et al., Neuropharmacology, (20130000), vol. 67, pages 155 - 167 | - RENNER et al., J. Cell Sci., (20120000), vol. 125, pages 2486 - 2499 | - WLODARCZYK et al., Biophys. J., (20080000), vol. 94, pages 986 - 1000 | - BRENNAMAN et al., Neurobiology of Disease, (20110000), vol. 43, pages 372 - 378 | - GUSEVA et al., Brain, (20090000), vol. 132, pages 2180 - 95 | - NELSON et al., Behavioral neuroscience, (20110000), vol. 125, pages 396 - 403 | - TAK et al., "Bimolecular Fluorescence Complementation; Lighting-Up Tau-Tau Interaction in Living Cells 2013", PLOS ONE, (20130000), vol. 8, doi:doi:10.1371/journal.pone.0081682, XP055452308 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1371/journal.pone.0081682 | - MACCIONI et al., Arch. Med. Res., (20010000), vol. 41, pages 226 - 231 | - HONG et al., Science, (19980000), vol. 282, page 1914 | - PEREZ et al., J. Neurochem., (20000000), vol. 74, pages 2583 - 2589 | - SAKAUE et al., J. Biol. Chem., (20050000), vol. 280, pages 31522 - 31529 | - KVACHNINA, J. Neurosci., (20050000), vol. 25, pages 7821 - 7830 | - SAYAS et al., J. Neurosci., (20020000), vol. 22, pages 6863 - 6875 | - LUND et al., Neurochem., (20010000), vol. 76, pages 1221 - 1232 | - LIU et al., Lett., (20020000), vol. 530, pages 209 - 214 | - NIKOLIC et al., Genes Dev., (19960000), vol. 10, pages 816 - 825 | - GREENBERGDAVIES, Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19900000), vol. 87, pages 5827 - 5831 | - RENSAHARA, Front. Neurol., (20130000), vol. 4 | - BERGER et al., J. Neurosci., (20070000), vol. 27, pages 3650 - 3662 | - ROBERSON et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 316, pages 750 - 754 | - GARETH et al., J. Neuro., (20070000), vol. 27, no. 11, pages 2948 - 2957 | - TAK et al., "Bimolecular Fluorescence Complementation; Lighting-Up Tau-Tau Interaction in Living Cells 2013", PLOS ONE, vol. 8 |