EP3870328 - BUILDING SYSTEM FOR CREATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/35] | BULDING SYSTEM FOR CREATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES | ||
[2023/32] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.08.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 30.10.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Åberg, Erik Stockholmsvägen 20 D 195 34 Stockholm / SE | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/35] | For all designated states Åberg, Erik Stockholmsvägen 20 D 195 34 Stockholm / SE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Straße 11 80636 München / DE | [2023/39] |
Former [2021/35] | Zacco Sweden AB P.O. Box 5581 114 85 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 19790327.1 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019SE51008 | Priority number, date | SE20180051306 | 23.10.2018 Original published format: SE 1851306 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020085974 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870328 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3870328 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63H33/06 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A63H33/062 (EP,KR,US);
A63H33/086 (KR,SE,US);
A63H33/06 (KR,SE)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BAUSYSTEM ZUR ERZEUGUNG DREIDIMENSIONALER STRUKTUREN | [2021/35] | English: | BUILDING SYSTEM FOR CREATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES | [2023/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CONSTRUCTION POUR CRÉER DE STRUCTURES EN TROIS DIMENSIONS | [2021/35] |
Former [2021/35] | BULDING SYSTEM FOR CREATING THREE-DIMENSIONAL STRUCTURES | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 20.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.06.2023 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 29.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 29.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 03.08.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | MC | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/32] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
MC | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 27.09.2023 | |
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/11] | HR | 27.09.2023 | |
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 27.12.2023 | |
GR | 28.12.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US6186855 (BAUER JEAN [CH], et al) [X] 10 * column 10, line 59 - column 11, line 25; figures 24-26 * [A] 1-9; | [A]GB2429934 (LIN WEN-PIN [TW]) [A] 1-10 * page 5, line 23 - page 11, line 27; figure - *; | [A]WO2008152164 (UNIV CATALUNYA POLITECNICA [ES], et al) [A] 1-10* the whole document *; | [A]CN204910786U (SHANGHAI ATA EDUCATIONAL SUPPLIES & TOYS CO LTD) [A] 1-10 * the whole document * |