EP3732437 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A THICKNESS OF AN ELONGATE OR EXTENDED STRUCTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/45] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DETERMINING A THICKNESS OF AN ELONGATE OR EXTENDED STRUCTURE | ||
[2022/06] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.06.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 06.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 14.02.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.10.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Guided Ultrasonics Ltd Wavemaker House 3 Brentwaters, Business Park The Ham Brentford London, Greater London TW8 8HQ / GB | [2020/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VINE, Keith c/o Guided Ultrasonics Ltd, Wavemaker House 3 Brentwaters Business Park The Ham Brentford, Greater London TW8 8HQ / GB | 02 /
VOGT, Thomas c/o Guided Ultrasonics Ltd, Wavemaker House 3 Brentwaters Business Park The Ham Brentford, Greater London TW8 8HQ / GB | 03 /
MILEWCZYK, Stefan Joshua c/o Guided Ultrasonics Ltd, Wavemaker House 3 Brentwaters Business Park The Ham Brentford, Greater London TW8 8HQ / GB | [2020/45] | Representative(s) | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP 406 Science Park Milton Road Cambridge CB4 0WW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/45] | Piotrowicz, Pawel Jan Andrzej, et al Venner Shipley LLP Byron House Cambridge Business Park Cowley Road Cambridge CB4 0WZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 19790720.7 | 09.10.2019 | [2020/45] | WO2019GB52865 | Priority number, date | GB20180016552 | 10.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201816552 | [2020/45] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020074895 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3732437 | Date: | 04.11.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/45] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3732437 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01B17/02, G01N29/07, G01N29/11, G01N29/46 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
G01B17/02 (EP,GB,US);
G01N29/043 (GB);
G01N29/07 (EP);
G01N29/11 (EP);
G01N29/46 (EP);
G01N2291/02854 (EP);
G01N2291/0425 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/45] | G01B17/02, G01N29/12, G01N29/34, G01N29/44, G01N29/46 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/45] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER DICKE EINER LÄNGLICHEN ODER GESTRECKTEN STRUKTUR | [2022/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR DETERMINING A THICKNESS OF AN ELONGATE OR EXTENDED STRUCTURE | [2022/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR DÉTERMINER UNE ÉPAISSEUR D'UNE STRUCTURE ALLONGÉE OU ÉTENDUE | [2022/06] |
Former [2020/45] | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME ZUR BESTIMMUNG DER DICKE EINER LÄNGLICHEN ODER GESTRECKTEN STRUKTUR | ||
Former [2020/45] | METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR DETERMINING A THICKNESS OF AN ELONGATE OR EXTENDED STRUCTURE | ||
Former [2020/45] | PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES POUR DÉTERMINER UNE ÉPAISSEUR D'UNE STRUCTURE ALLONGÉE OU ÉTENDUE | Entry into regional phase | 31.07.2020 | National basic fee paid | 31.07.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.07.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.07.2020 | Examination requested [2020/45] | 31.07.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.01.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.02.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.04.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 20.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP22190609.2 / EP4130655 | Opposition(s) | 19.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 09.10.2019 | AL | 17.08.2022 | AT | 17.08.2022 | BG | 17.08.2022 | CY | 17.08.2022 | CZ | 17.08.2022 | DK | 17.08.2022 | EE | 17.08.2022 | ES | 17.08.2022 | FI | 17.08.2022 | HR | 17.08.2022 | LT | 17.08.2022 | LV | 17.08.2022 | MC | 17.08.2022 | MK | 17.08.2022 | NL | 17.08.2022 | PL | 17.08.2022 | RO | 17.08.2022 | RS | 17.08.2022 | SE | 17.08.2022 | SI | 17.08.2022 | SK | 17.08.2022 | SM | 17.08.2022 | IE | 09.10.2022 | LU | 09.10.2022 | BE | 31.10.2022 | CH | 31.10.2022 | LI | 31.10.2022 | NO | 17.11.2022 | GR | 18.11.2022 | IS | 17.12.2022 | PT | 19.12.2022 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 09.10.2019 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
MK | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/25] | HU | 09.10.2019 | |
AL | 17.08.2022 | ||
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CY | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
IE | 09.10.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
BE | 31.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SI | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
CH | 31.10.2022 | ||
LI | 31.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
LU | 09.10.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 17.08.2022 | |
AT | 17.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
MC | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
EE | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SK | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 17.08.2022 | |
CZ | 17.08.2022 | ||
DK | 17.08.2022 | ||
ES | 17.08.2022 | ||
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RO | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 17.08.2022 | |
FI | 17.08.2022 | ||
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
SM | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
IS | 17.12.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
PL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
HR | 17.08.2022 | ||
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
GR | 18.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
LV | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | ||
PT | 19.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 17.08.2022 | |
LT | 17.08.2022 | ||
NL | 17.08.2022 | ||
RS | 17.08.2022 | ||
SE | 17.08.2022 | ||
NO | 17.11.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XI]US4305294 (VASILE CARMINE F, et al) [X] 15,17,23 * column 4, line 41 - column 5, line 65; figure 1 * [I] 1-14,16,18-22,24-35; | [A]US5965818 (WANG WEICHENG DAVID [US]) [A] 1-37 * column 2, line 3 - column 5, line 4; figures 1-5 *; | [A]GB2552858 (GUIDED ULTRASONICS LTD [GB]) [A] 1-37 * page 10, line 14 - page 11, line 15; figure 2 ** page 12, line 7 - page 13, line 8; figure 5 *; | [XI] - J.L. ROSE ET AL, "Using ultrasonic guided wave mode cutoff for corrosion detection and classification", PROCEEDINGS / 1998 IEEE ULTRASONICS SYMPOSIUM : OCTOBER 5 - 8, 1998, HOTEL METROPOLITAN SENDAI, SENDAI, MIYAGI, JAPAN ; AN INTERNATIONAL SYMPOSIUM, Piscataway, NJ, USA, (19980101), vol. 1, doi:10.1109/ULTSYM.1998.762277, ISBN 978-0-7803-4095-4, pages 851 - 854, XP055656522 [X] 15,17,23,33,36,37 * EXPERIMENTAL RESULTS; pages 853-854 * [I] 1-14,16,18-22,24-32,34,35 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ULTSYM.1998.762277 | by applicant | - "Ultrasonic Measurement of Pipe Thickness", C. LEBOWITZL. BROWN, Review of Progress in Quantitative Nondestructive Evaluation, Plenum Press, (19930000), vol. 12, page 1987 |