EP3870725 - HOT ROLLED STEEL AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ArcelorMittal 24-26 Boulevard d'Avranches 1160 Luxembourg / LU | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE STRYCKER, Joost Kil 25 9240 Zele / BE | 02 /
VAN DEN BERGH, Krista Doornstraat 71 C 9170 Sint-Gillis-Waas / BE | 03 /
VEYS, Xavier Floralienlaan 493 2610 Wilrijk / BE | 04 /
FERNANDEZ MACIA, Lucia Charles Maurice Wiserplein 10 1040 Brussels / BE | 05 /
GUNGOR AYAS, Ozlem Belgielei 41 2018 Antwerp / BE | 06 /
LIEBEHERR, Martin Borluutlaan 27 9840 De Pinte / BE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Plaisant, Sophie Marie ArcelorMittal France Research & Development Intellectual Property 6, rue André Campra, Immeuble Le Cézanne 93200 Saint-Denis / FR | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19790861.9 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019IB59001 | Priority number, date | WO2018IB58255 | 23.10.2018 Original published format: PCT/IB2018/058255 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084478 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870725 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C21D8/02, C22C38/00, C22C38/02, C22C38/04, C22C38/06, C22C38/12, C22C38/14, C22C38/16, C22C38/20, C22C38/22, C22C38/24, C22C38/26, C22C38/28 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
C22C38/008 (EP,US);
C21D9/46 (US);
C21D6/004 (US);
C21D6/005 (US);
C21D6/008 (US);
C21D8/0205 (US);
C21D8/0226 (EP,US);
C21D8/0263 (EP);
C22C38/001 (US);
C22C38/002 (US);
C22C38/02 (EP,US);
C22C38/04 (EP,US);
C22C38/06 (EP,US);
C22C38/12 (EP);
C22C38/14 (EP);
C22C38/16 (EP);
C22C38/20 (EP);
C22C38/22 (EP);
C22C38/24 (EP);
C22C38/26 (EP);
C22C38/28 (EP);
C22C38/42 (US);
C22C38/44 (US);
C22C38/46 (US);
C22C38/48 (US);
C22C38/50 (US);
C21D2211/002 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | WARMGEWALZTER STAHL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/35] | English: | HOT ROLLED STEEL AND A METHOD OF MANUFACTURING THEREOF | [2021/35] | French: | ACIER LAMINÉ À CHAUD ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 25.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 18.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 09.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011120550 (ARCELORMITTAL INVESTIGACION Y DESARROLLO SL [ES], et al) [A] 1-19* the whole document *; | [XI]JP2012092379 (SUMITOMO METAL IND) [X] 11-14,16-19 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0011] - [0 21] , [0 37] - [0041] - [0 92] - [0097] - [ 109] - [0110] * [I] 15; | [A]WO2014181534 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2016092756 (JFE STEEL CORP [JP]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP2553132 |