EP3860941 - PAPER MILL REWINDER WITH CONTINUOUS REEL CHANGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.11.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 01.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.06.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tecno Paper Srl Via San Martino 36 Frazione Marlia 55012 Capannori (LU) / IT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BALDACCINI, Paolo Via Madonnina, 12 Frazione LUNATA 55012 CAPANNORI (LU) / IT | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Mari, Marco Giovanni, et al Ing. Mari & C. S.r.l. Via Garibotti, 3 26100 Cremona / IT | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 19790868.4 | 02.10.2019 | [2021/32] | WO2019IT50216 | Priority number, date | IT20180009199 | 05.10.2018 Original published format: IT201800009199 | [2021/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020070765 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3860941 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B65H19/22, B65H19/30 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
B65H19/223 (EP,US);
B65H19/2207 (EP);
B65H19/2246 (EP,US);
B65H19/2253 (EP,US);
B65H19/2269 (EP,US);
B65H19/30 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41425 (EP);
B65H2301/41427 (EP,US);
B65H2301/41468 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Title | German: | PAPIERMÜHLENAUFWICKLER MIT VORRICHTUNG ZUM KONTINUIERLICHEN ROLLENWECHSEL | [2021/32] | English: | PAPER MILL REWINDER WITH CONTINUOUS REEL CHANGE DEVICE | [2021/32] | French: | REBOBINEUSE DE PAPETERIE AVEC DISPOSITIF DE CHANGEMENT DE BOBINE EN CONTINU | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.02.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9306033 (VALMET KARLSTAD AB [SE]); | [XAI]US5249758 (MUELLER GERNOT [DE], et al); | [A]US5593106 (CAVANAGH KENNETH M [US]); | [A]EP0860391 (VALMET CORP [FI]); | [A]DE102008018890 (ANCIENT ENERGY GMBH & CO KG [DE]) |