EP3850019 - LOW-VISCOSITY CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS FOR COATINGS AND MATERIALS HAVING A HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND A HIGH THERMAL DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/29] | CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS HAVING A LOW VISCOSITY FOR COATINGS AND MATERIALS WITH A HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND A HIGH HEAT DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE | ||
[2022/15] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 18.04.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 18.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 21.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ARKEMA FRANCE 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [2021/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MONNIER, Guillaume c/o ARKEMA FRANCE Parc Technologique ALATA Rue Jacques Taffanel 60550 Verneuil-en-Halatte / FR | [2022/38] |
Former [2021/29] | 01 /
MONNIER, Guillaume ARKEMA FRANCE Parc Technologique ALATA Rue Jacques Taffanel 60550 VERNEUIL EN HALATTE / FR | Representative(s) | Arkema Patent Arkema France DRD-DPI 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92705 Colombes Cedex / FR | [2021/29] | Application number, filing date | 19791315.5 | 09.09.2019 | [2021/29] | WO2019FR52069 | Priority number, date | FR20180058126 | 11.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858126 | [2021/29] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020053512 | Date: | 19.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3850019 | Date: | 21.07.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3850019 | Date: | 21.09.2022 | Language: | FR | [2022/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B33Y70/00, C08F220/30, C08F222/10, C09D4/00, G02B1/04 | [2022/15] | CPC: |
C08F220/30 (EP,IL);
C08F222/1025 (IL,US);
B29C64/129 (US);
B33Y10/00 (US);
B33Y70/00 (EP,IL,US);
C08F2/50 (US);
C08F220/12 (US);
C08F220/20 (IL,US);
C08F222/1006 (EP,IL);
C08F222/102 (IL);
C08F222/1045 (IL,US);
C08F222/106 (EP,IL);
C08L33/08 (IL);
C08L33/10 (IL);
C08L75/16 (IL);
| C-Set: |
C08F220/30, C08F222/1025, C08F222/1045, C08F222/102, C08F220/20 (EP);
C08F220/30, C08F222/1045, C08F222/1025, C08F222/102 (EP);
C08F220/30, C08F222/1045, C08F222/1025, C08F222/1025, C08F220/20 (EP);
C08F220/30, C08F222/1045, C08F222/1025, C08F222/102, C08F220/20 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F220/30 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/1045 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08L33/08 (EP);
G02B1/041, C08L33/10 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/29] | C08F220/30, C08F222/10, G02B1/04, C09D4/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | NIEDRIGE VISKOSITÄTSVERNETZBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN FÜR BESCHICHTUNGEN UND MATERIALIEN MIT EINEM HOHEN BRECHUNGSINDEX UND EINER HOHEN THERMISCHEN VERFORMUNGSTEMPERATUR | [2022/15] | English: | LOW-VISCOSITY CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS FOR COATINGS AND MATERIALS HAVING A HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND A HIGH THERMAL DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE | [2022/15] | French: | COMPOSITIONS RÉTICULABLES AYANT UNE FAIBLE VISCOSITÉ POUR REVÊTEMENTS ET MATERIAUX À HAUT INDICE DE RÉFRACTION ET À TEMPÉRATURE DE DÉFLEXION THERMIQUE ÉLEVÉE | [2022/19] |
Former [2021/29] | VERNETZBARE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT NIEDRIGER VISKOSITÄT FÜR BESCHICHTUNGEN UND MATERIALIEN MIT HOHEM BRECHUNGSINDEX UND HOHER WÄRMEFORMBESTÄNDIGKEIT | ||
Former [2021/29] | CROSSLINKABLE COMPOSITIONS HAVING A LOW VISCOSITY FOR COATINGS AND MATERIALS WITH A HIGH REFRACTIVE INDEX AND A HIGH HEAT DEFLECTION TEMPERATURE | ||
Former [2021/29] | COMPOSITIONS RETICULABLES AYANT UNE FAIBLE VISCOSITE POUR REVETEMENTS ET MATERIAUX A HAUT INDICE DE REFRACTION ET A TEMPERATURE DE DEFLEXION THERMIQUE ELEVEE | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/29] | 15.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.04.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 01.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 21.09.2022 | AT | 21.09.2022 | CZ | 21.09.2022 | DK | 21.09.2022 | EE | 21.09.2022 | ES | 21.09.2022 | FI | 21.09.2022 | HR | 21.09.2022 | IT | 21.09.2022 | LT | 21.09.2022 | LV | 21.09.2022 | MC | 21.09.2022 | PL | 21.09.2022 | RO | 21.09.2022 | RS | 21.09.2022 | SE | 21.09.2022 | SI | 21.09.2022 | SK | 21.09.2022 | SM | 21.09.2022 | NO | 21.12.2022 | GR | 22.12.2022 | IS | 21.01.2023 | PT | 23.01.2023 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/26] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
IT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SI | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
DK | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 21.09.2022 | |
AT | 21.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
PL | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
IS | 21.01.2023 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
EE | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SK | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 21.09.2022 | |
CZ | 21.09.2022 | ||
ES | 21.09.2022 | ||
FI | 21.09.2022 | ||
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RO | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
PT | 23.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
SM | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
HR | 21.09.2022 | ||
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
GR | 22.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
LV | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 21.09.2022 | |
LT | 21.09.2022 | ||
RS | 21.09.2022 | ||
SE | 21.09.2022 | ||
NO | 21.12.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2006069222 (CHISHOLM BRET J [US], et al) [A] 1-37 * paragraphs [0001] , [0007] , [0018] - [0023]; figure V; claims 1-27 *; | [AD]EP2586802 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [AD] 1-37 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0006] , [0074] - [0076]; examples 1-5; table 1 *; | [AD]EP2664635 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP]) [AD] 1-37* paragraphs [0001] , [0006] , [0007] , [0060] - [0062]; examples 1-6; table 1 * | by applicant | US6515166 | WO2014126830 | WO2014126834 | WO2014126837 | EP2586802 | EP2664635 | EP2684903 | - TUMBLESTON et al., "Continuous Liquid Interface Production of 3D Objects", Science, (20150320), vol. 347, no. 6228, doi:10.1126/science.aaa2397, pages 1349 - 1352, XP055247221 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.aaa2397 |