EP3870312 - A SYSTEM HAVING A BATTERY POWERED BLOWER UNIT FOR A POWERED AIR PURIFYING RESPIRATOR AND AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED ACCESSORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 02.04.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.04.2022 | Withdrawal of application | published on 04.05.2022 [2022/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states 3M Innovative Properties Company 3M Center Post Office Box 33427 Saint Paul, Minnesota 55133-3427 / US | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FREJD, Jonas N. A. Bollstanäsvägen 3 191 89 Sollentuna / SE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Vollmers, Hans-Gerd 3M Deutschland GmbH 3M Office of Intellectual Property Counsel Carl-Schurz-Straße 1 41453 Neuss / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19791375.9 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019IB59006 | Priority number, date | EP20180202731 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: EP 18202731 | [2021/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020084482 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870312 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A62B18/00, A62B18/08, H01R13/633, H01R13/635 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A62B18/006 (EP,US);
A62B18/08 (EP,US);
F04D25/0673 (US);
F04D25/0693 (US);
F04D29/703 (US);
H01R13/635 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | SYSTEM MIT EINER BATTERIEBETRIEBENEN GEBLÄSEEINHEIT FÜR EIN LUFTREINIGENDES ATEMSCHUTZGERÄT UND EIN ELEKTRISCH BETRIEBENES ZUBEHÖR | [2021/35] | English: | A SYSTEM HAVING A BATTERY POWERED BLOWER UNIT FOR A POWERED AIR PURIFYING RESPIRATOR AND AN ELECTRICALLY POWERED ACCESSORY | [2021/35] | French: | SYSTÈME AYANT UNE UNITÉ FORMANT SOUFFLANTE ALIMENTÉE PAR BATTERIE POUR UN RESPIRATEUR DE PURIFICATION D'AIR ALIMENTÉ ET UN ACCESSOIRE ALIMENTÉ ÉLECTRIQUEMENT | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 14.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 30.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.03.2022 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2022/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2109246 (CHAN HUU SHYN, et al) [A] 1-15 * figure - * * figures 2,5,6 *; | [Y]DE10261602 (YAMAMOTO KOGAKU [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - *; | [Y]DE4214016 (BREUST VOLKER [DE]) [Y] 1-15 * figure - * * column 1, lines 8-16 *; | [A]FR840623 (BENNO ADLER) [A] 1,12 * figure - * |