EP3777274 - AGGREGATING NETWORK CELL DATA TO ADDRESS USER PRIVACY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, WA 98006-1350 / US | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AL-KABRA, Rami c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | 02 /
BODIGA, Prem Kumar c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | 03 /
DAHLSTROM, Noah c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | 04 /
RIVARD, Kevin c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | [2024/37] |
Former [2021/07] | 01 /
AL-KABRA, Rami c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | ||
02 /
BODIGA, Prem Kumar c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | |||
03 /
DAHLSTROM, Noah c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | |||
04 /
RIVARD, Kevin c/o T-Mobile USA, Inc. 12920 SE 38th Street Bellevue, Washington 98006-1350 / US | Representative(s) | Suddaby, Mark Edward Novagraaf UK 1st Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/37] | Suddaby, Mark Edward Novagraaf UK 3rd Floor 77 Gracechurch Street London EC3V 0AS / GB | ||
Former [2021/07] | Hanna Moore + Curley Garryard House 25-26 Earlsfort Terrace Dublin 2, D02 PX51 / IE | Application number, filing date | 19791445.0 | 29.03.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019US24859 | Priority number, date | US201815965193 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US201815965193 | [2021/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209463 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3777274 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3777274 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W12/02, H04L67/50, // G06F21/62, H04L9/40 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
H04W12/02 (EP,US);
G06F21/6254 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP);
H04W24/08 (US);
G06F16/285 (US);
H04L63/0421 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | H04W12/02, H04L29/08, // H04L29/06, G06F21/62 | ||
Former IPC [2021/07] | H04W12/02, H04W12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | AGGREGATION VON NETZWERKZELLENDATEN FÜR ADRESSBENUTZERDATENSCHUTZ | [2021/07] | English: | AGGREGATING NETWORK CELL DATA TO ADDRESS USER PRIVACY | [2021/07] | French: | AGRÉGATION DE DONNÉES DE CELLULE DE RÉSEAU POUR TRAITER LA CONFIDENTIALITÉ DE L'UTILISATEUR | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 27.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 13.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 02.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2012136245 (NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS OY [FI], et al); | International search | [A]US2006123462 (LUNT TERESA F [US], et al); | [Y]US2011255688 (SPALINK JAN-DIETER [US], et al); | [A]US8909711 (STADDON JESSICA [US], et al); | [Y]US2015177005 (STEINMETZ WILLIAM HENRY [US], et al); | [A]US2018109918 (COLONNA MASSIMO [IT], et al) | by applicant | WO2012136245 |