EP3784313 - DELIVERY DEVICE AND ADSORBENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Becton, Dickinson and Company 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, NJ 07417-1880 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NOVAK, Matthew 916 W. Trinity Av., Unit 9 Durham, North Carolina 27701 / US | 02 /
MAINZ, Emilie 8 Island Hill Avenue Malden, Massachusetts 02148 / US | 03 /
RINI, Christopher 9428 Cartersville Court Raleigh, North Carolina 27617 / US | 04 /
ROBERTS, Bruce 1 Becton Drive Franklin Lakes, New Jersey 07417 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19791452.6 | 19.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US28248 | Priority number, date | US201862663605P | 27.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663605 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209644 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784313 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/165, A61B5/00, A61B5/145, A61J1/00, A61J1/14, A61L2/02, A61M5/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
A61M5/14248 (EP,US);
A61M5/165 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/28 (US);
A61K47/10 (US);
A61K9/0019 (US);
A61M5/28 (US);
A61M5/3145 (EP,CN,US);
A61M5/32 (US);
A61M5/3202 (EP);
A61M5/347 (EP);
B01D15/10 (CN);
B01D15/20 (US);
B01D36/003 (CN);
A61M2205/3334 (US);
A61M2205/759 (CN,US);
B01D15/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | ABGABEVORRICHTUNG UND ADSORPTIONSMITTEL | [2021/09] | English: | DELIVERY DEVICE AND ADSORBENT | [2021/09] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ADMINISTRATION ET ADSORBANT | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 20.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002060180 (SUGISAKI TAKASHI [JP]); | [XAI]US2016354542 (WARD WILLIAM KENNETH [US], et al); | [A]US2017232204 (KNAPP KEITH [US], et al) | International search | [Y]US2011203585 (COZEAN JESSE [US], et al); | [A]US2012253022 (KOTANKO PETER [US], et al); | [XY]US2016354542 (WARD WILLIAM KENNETH [US], et al) | by applicant | US2002060180 | US2006229562 | US2007149924 | US2016354542 | US2017028128 | US2017232204 |