EP3787087 - ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung SDI Co., Ltd. 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-gu Yongin-si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Hyun Ki 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-Si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | 02 /
CHOI, Min Yeol 150-20, Gongse-ro, Giheung-Gu Yongin-Si, Gyeonggi-do 17084 / KR | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Shearman, James Ward Marks & Clerk LLP 15 Fetter Lane London EC4A 1BW / GB | Application number, filing date | 19791677.8 | 22.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019KR04807 | Priority number, date | KR20180047453 | 24.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180047453 | [2021/09] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208985 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787087 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M50/533, H01M50/538, H01M50/548, H01M50/107, H01M50/46, H01M50/466 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
H01M10/0431 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/538 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0587 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/107 (EP,US);
H01M50/46 (EP,KR,US);
H01M50/466 (EP,US);
H01M50/533 (EP,US);
H01M50/534 (EP,US);
H01M50/536 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | H01M10/04, H01M10/0587, H01M2/26 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | ELEKTRODENANORDNUNG, SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE DAMIT UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON | [2021/09] | English: | ELECTRODE ASSEMBLY, SECONDARY BATTERY INCLUDING SAME, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING SAME | [2021/09] | French: | ENSEMBLE ÉLECTRODE, BATTERIE SECONDAIRE LE COMPRENANT ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | Translation filed | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2004234994 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0018]; figures 1,2 *; | [XY]KR100462128B (MITSUI BUSSAN KK) [X] 1,3,4,6-8 * figures 2,4,13a,13b * [Y] 2,5,9,10; | [Y]US7875379 (MOCERI KENNETH [US], et al) [Y] 5 * column 1, line 53 - line 54; figures 5,7 * * column 5, line 8 - line 15 *; | [A]US2015295270 (CHUN KWAN-SIC [KR]) [A] 1-10* figures 2-4 *; | [Y]KR20160129571 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 2,9,10 * figure 5 * | International search | [Y]JP2004234994 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0018J, [0023], [0029] and figures 1, 2. *; | [A]KR100462128B (MATSUMOTO, Isao) [A] 1-10 * See claims 1, 8 and figure 1. *; | [A]KR20160129571 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-10* See paragraphs [0027], [0036] and figures 2, 3. *; | [Y]KR20180022429 (SAMSUNG SDI CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4, 5, 10 * See paragraph [0032] and figure 3. *; | [Y]KR20180036455 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-10 * See paragraphs [0054], [0056], [0057] and figures 10, 11. * |