EP3787012 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimohozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MITA, Ryota c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
ICHIKAWA, Tomoaki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION, 1-2, Shimohozumi 1- chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19792041.6 | 27.03.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019JP13138 | Priority number, date | JP20180086475 | 27.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018086475 | JP20180168832 | 10.09.2018 Original published format: JP 2018168832 | [2021/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208071 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787012 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01L21/52, C09J7/10, C09J7/30, C09J9/02, C09J11/04, C09J201/00, H01L21/301, H01L23/00, H01L21/78, H01L21/67, H01L21/683 | [2022/06] | CPC: |
H01L21/6836 (EP,US);
H01L24/83 (EP,US);
H01L21/4853 (US);
H01L21/565 (US);
H01L21/67132 (EP);
H01L21/67144 (EP);
H01L21/78 (EP,US);
H01L24/27 (EP);
H01L24/29 (EP,US);
H01L24/32 (EP,US);
H01L24/48 (EP,US);
H01L24/73 (US);
H01L24/85 (EP);
H01L24/92 (EP);
H01L24/94 (EP);
H01L24/95 (EP);
H01L2221/68322 (EP);
H01L2221/68327 (EP);
H01L2221/68336 (EP,US);
H01L2221/6834 (EP);
H01L2221/68368 (EP);
H01L2221/68381 (EP);
H01L2224/27002 (EP);
H01L2224/27436 (EP);
H01L2224/29239 (US);
H01L2224/29247 (US);
H01L2224/29286 (US);
H01L2224/29294 (EP);
H01L2224/293 (EP);
H01L2224/32225 (US);
H01L2224/32227 (EP);
H01L2224/32245 (EP);
H01L2224/48091 (EP);
H01L2224/48225 (US);
H01L2224/48227 (EP);
H01L2224/48247 (EP);
H01L2224/73265 (EP,US);
H01L2224/75745 (EP);
H01L2224/83065 (EP);
H01L2224/83075 (EP);
H01L2224/8309 (EP);
H01L2224/83191 (EP);
H01L2224/83204 (EP);
H01L2224/8384 (EP,US);
H01L2224/83907 (EP);
H01L2224/83986 (EP);
H01L2224/85207 (EP);
H01L2224/92 (EP);
H01L2224/92247 (EP);
H01L2224/94 (EP);
H01L2224/95 (EP);
H01L23/49513 (EP);
H01L24/45 (EP);
H01L2924/01029 (US);
H01L2924/01047 (US);
H01L2924/0541 (US);
H01L2924/10272 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2224/27436, H01L2924/00012 (EP);
H01L2224/48091, H01L2924/00014 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32225, H01L2224/48227, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/73265, H01L2224/32245, H01L2224/48247, H01L2924/00 (EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2221/68304, H01L21/78, H01L2224/27, H01L2221/68368, H01L2221/68381, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2221/68304, H01L21/78, H01L2224/27, H01L2221/68381, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2221/68304, H01L2224/27, H01L21/78, H01L2221/68381, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/92, H01L2221/68304, H01L2224/27, H01L2221/68368, H01L21/78, H01L2221/68381, H01L2224/83 (EP);
H01L2224/94, H01L2224/27 (EP);
H01L2224/95, H01L2224/27 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/09] | H01L21/52, C09J7/10, C09J7/30, C09J9/02, C09J11/04, C09J201/00, H01L21/301 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR HALBLEITERBAUELEMENT | [2021/09] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR SEMICONDUCTOR DEVICE | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION POUR DISPOSITIF À SEMI-CONDUCTEUR | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.2020 | Translation filed | 05.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 05.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102006033073 (DANFOSS SILICON POWER GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-6,9-15 * paragraphs [0029] - [0033]; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2012037688 (KOCK MATHIAS [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0007] - [0009] - [0 38] - [0041] *; | [XAI]US2014057396 (BEHRENS THOMAS [DE], et al) [X] 1,2,4,6,15 * figures 1, 2 * * paragraphs [0018] - [0037] * [A] 3,9-14 [I] 5; | [A]US2014061909 (SPECKELS ROLAND [DE], et al) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0022] - [0025] *; | [A]US2014131898 (SHEARER CATHERINE [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-15 * figure 1 * * paragraphs [0009] - [0016] - [0 52] - [0063] * * example 3 *; | [A]US2016365323 (VISWANATHAN LAKSHMINARAYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-6,9-15 * figures 6, 11-14 ** paragraphs [0041] - [0044] - [0 52] - [0056] *; | [A]JP6147176B (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [A] 1 * figures 1-3 * * paragraphs [0016] - [0027] * | International search | [XY]JP2011119767 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [X] 1-2, 4, 6, 15- 18 * , paragraphs [0001], [0029]-[0056], fig. 3-6 * [Y] 5, 9; | [X]JP2011171688 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [X] 10-11, 13 * , paragraphs [0001], [0020]-[0063], fig. 3-10 *; | [A]JP2011253939 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [A] 1-18 * , paragraphs [0001], [0017]-[0064], fig. 2-10 *; | [A]JP2011253940 (SONY CHEM & INF DEVICE CORP) [A] 1-18* , paragraphs [0001], [0014]-[0071], fig. 2-11 *; | [Y]JP2017147293 (HITACHI CHEMICAL CO LTD) [Y] 5, 9 * , paragraphs [0001], [0054]-[0057], [0062], [0063], fig. 2, 6 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2018060850 (NITTO DENKO CORP) [Y] 5, 9 * , paragraphs [0001], [0091]-[0097], fig. 2-4 * | by applicant | JP2002192370 | WO2008065728 | JP2013039580 |