EP3786215 - CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING AQUEOUS DISPERSION AND CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/09] | CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING AQUEOUS DISPERSION | ||
[2024/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000006 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSUZUKI, Junichi c/o ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA, 1-1-2 Yurakucho Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-0006 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [2024/39] |
Former [2021/09] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 19792058.0 | 15.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019JP16217 | Priority number, date | JP20180082268 | 23.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018082268 | JP20180096460 | 18.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018096460 | JP20180193575 | 12.10.2018 Original published format: JP 2018193575 | JP20180213081 | 13.11.2018 Original published format: JP 2018213081 | [2021/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208313 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786215 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3786215 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/04, C08L1/02, C08J3/05, C08L23/10, C08H8/00, C08G18/64, C08L23/12, C08L59/02, C08L75/04, C08L77/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
C08J5/045 (EP,US);
C08G18/6484 (EP);
C08H8/00 (EP);
C08J3/05 (EP,US);
C08K5/005 (US);
C08K7/02 (US);
C08L1/02 (EP);
C08L23/10 (EP);
C08L23/12 (EP);
C08L59/02 (EP);
C08L71/02 (US);
C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L77/02 (EP);
B82Y30/00 (US);
B82Y40/00 (US);
C08G2650/58 (EP);
C08J2301/02 (EP);
C08J2323/12 (EP);
C08J2359/02 (EP);
C08J2371/02 (US);
C08J2377/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L1/02, C08K5/005, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L1/02, C08L71/02, C09J175/04 (EP);
C08L1/02, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L23/10, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08K5/005, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L23/12, C08L1/02, C08L71/02, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L59/02, C08K5/005, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L59/02, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L59/02, C08L1/02, C08L71/02, C08L75/04 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L1/02 (EP);
C08L75/04, C08L71/02 (EP);
C08L77/02, C08K5/005, C08L1/02, C08L71/02 (EP); |
Former IPC [2021/23] | C08J5/04, C08J3/03, C08K5/00, C08L1/02, C08J3/05 | ||
Former IPC [2021/09] | C08J3/03, C08J5/04, C08K5/00, C08L1/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CELLULOSENANOFASERHALTIGE WÄSSRIGE DISPERSION UND CELLULOSENANOFASERHALTIGE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/17] | English: | CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING AQUEOUS DISPERSION AND CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING RESIN COMPOSITION | [2024/17] | French: | DISPERSION AQUEUSE CONTENANT DES NANOFIBRES DE CELLULOSE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE CONTENANT DES NANOFIBRES DE CELLULOSE | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/09] | CELLULOSE-NANOFASERNHALTIGE WÄSSRIGE DISPERSION | ||
Former [2021/09] | CELLULOSE NANOFIBER-CONTAINING AQUEOUS DISPERSION | ||
Former [2021/09] | DISPERSION AQUEUSE CONTENANT DES NANOFIBRES DE CELLULOSE | Entry into regional phase | 22.10.2020 | Translation filed | 22.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 26.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]JP2012102324 (RIKEN TECHNOS CORP, et al); | [XY]JP2012201767 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [X]JP2018505285 ; | [X]JP2018044054 (SEKISUI POLYMATECH CO LTD); | [X]JP2018510931 ; | International search | [X]JP2010536965 ; | [X]JP2012102324 (RIKEN TECHNOS CORP, et al); | [X]JP2012201767 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al); | [X]WO2013035461 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS [JP], et al); | [X]JP2013217006 (NICCA CHEMICAL CO); | [X]JP2014009290 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2015117340 (SAN NOPCO KK); | [X]JP2016196711 (DAINIPPON INK & CHEMICALS); | [X]JP2016210893 (JAPAN ADVANCED INST OF SCIENCE & TECH HOKURIKU, et al); | [A]JP2017218595 (UNIV KYOTO, et al); | [X]JP2018505285 ; | [X]JP2018044054 (SEKISUI POLYMATECH CO LTD); | [X]JP2018510931 | by applicant | JPH07228775 | JP2003055549 | JP5797129B | WO2017159823 | WO2018123150 |