EP3784990 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RETRIEVING TUMOR-RELATED ANTIBODIES AND ANTIGENS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of the University of Pennsylvania 3600 Civic Center Boulevard, 9th Floor Philadelphia PA 19104 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUA, Xianxin 939 Clover Hill Road Wynnewood, Pennsylvania 19096 / US | 02 /
HE, Xin 4427 Walnut Street, Apt. 1 Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | 03 /
FENG, Zijie 4437 Spruce Street, 2nd Floor Philadelphia, Pennsylvania 19104 / US | 04 /
SIEGEL, Donald L. 2582 Brandon Court Lansdale, Pennsylvania 19446 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19792926.8 | 26.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US29333 | Priority number, date | US201862663074P | 26.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862663074 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019210155 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784990 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01C21/36 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
C07K14/70578 (EP,US);
A61K35/17 (US);
A61K39/4611 (EP);
A61K39/4631 (EP);
A61K39/464401 (EP);
A61K39/464429 (EP);
A61K47/68033 (EP,US);
A61K47/6849 (EP,US);
A61P35/02 (EP);
C07K14/7051 (EP,US);
C07K14/70517 (US);
C07K14/70521 (US);
C07K16/28 (EP);
C07K16/2896 (EP,US);
C07K16/3061 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP);
A61K2039/5154 (US);
A61K2039/5158 (US);
A61K2039/80 (EP);
A61K2039/804 (EP);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2317/22 (EP);
C07K2317/53 (US);
C07K2317/565 (US);
C07K2317/569 (EP,US);
C07K2317/622 (US);
C07K2319/02 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUM AUFFINDEN VON TUMORBEZOGENEN ANTIKÖRPERN UND ANTIGENEN | [2021/09] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR RETRIEVING TUMOR-RELATED ANTIBODIES AND ANTIGENS | [2021/09] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS POUR RÉCUPÉRER DES ANTICORPS ET DES ANTIGÈNES ASSOCIÉS À UNE TUMEUR | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 25.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 25.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 19.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010123874 (OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD [GB], et al); | [Y]KR20130138802 (OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]); | [Y]EP2078202 (OXFORD BIOTHERAPEUTICS LTD [GB]) | International search | [A]US2009175846 (MI SHA [US], et al); | [A]US2009304696 (LAWSON ALASTAIR DAVID GRIFFITHS [GB], et al); | [Y]US2013266551 (CAMPANA DARIO [SG], et al); | [Y]WO2014167126 (UNIV DE COIMBRA [PT]); | [Y]US2016053017 (ORENTAS RIMAS J [US], et al); | [XYA]US2016340406 (ZHAO YANGBING [US], et al); | [A]WO2017153402 (VIB VZW [BE], et al); | [A]US2017275362 (BRENTJENS RENIER J [US], et al); | [A]WO2017172981 (UNIV SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA [US]); | [A]US2017355757 (HU YING [US], et al); |