EP3785425 - CROWDSOURCED PREDICTION OF CDN PERFORMANCE FOR ZERO BUFFER DELIVERY OF CONTENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 09.05.2025 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.12.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU | published on 22.01.2025 [2025/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Roku, Inc. 1155 Coleman Ave San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ASNIS, Ilya 1842 Lencar Way San Jose, California 95124 / US | 02 /
MICHIELS, Wim c/o ROKU, INC. 1155 Coleman Ave San Jose, CA 95110 / US | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2023/30] |
Former [2021/09] | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | Application number, filing date | 19793169.4 | 24.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US28892 | Priority number, date | US201815961054 | 24.04.2018 Original published format: US201815961054 | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209934 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3785425 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3785425 | Date: | 26.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L65/1089, H04L67/10, H04L65/612, H04L67/52, H04L67/50, H04L65/75 | [2023/12] | CPC: |
H04L65/1089 (EP);
H04L65/612 (EP,US);
H04L65/764 (EP);
H04L65/765 (EP);
H04L67/10 (EP,US);
H04L67/52 (EP,US);
H04L67/535 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/51] | H04L29/08, H04L29/06 | ||
Former IPC [2021/09] | H04L29/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CROWD-GESOURCTE VORHERSAGE DER CDN-LEISTUNG FÜR NULLPUFFERBEREITSTELLUNG VON INHALT | [2021/09] | English: | CROWDSOURCED PREDICTION OF CDN PERFORMANCE FOR ZERO BUFFER DELIVERY OF CONTENT | [2021/09] | French: | PRÉDICTION À EXTERNALISATION OUVERTE DE PERFORMANCES CDN POUR UNE DISTRIBUTION DE CONTENU ZÉRO TAMPON | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 10.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 16.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.07.2023 | BG | 26.07.2023 | CZ | 26.07.2023 | DK | 26.07.2023 | EE | 26.07.2023 | ES | 26.07.2023 | FI | 26.07.2023 | HR | 26.07.2023 | IT | 26.07.2023 | LT | 26.07.2023 | LV | 26.07.2023 | MC | 26.07.2023 | PL | 26.07.2023 | RO | 26.07.2023 | RS | 26.07.2023 | SE | 26.07.2023 | SI | 26.07.2023 | SK | 26.07.2023 | SM | 26.07.2023 | NO | 26.10.2023 | GR | 27.10.2023 | IS | 26.11.2023 | PT | 27.11.2023 | LU | 24.04.2024 | [2025/04] |
Former [2024/52] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
BG | 26.07.2023 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
MC | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/51] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
BG | 26.07.2023 | ||
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/36] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SI | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
IT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
EE | 26.07.2023 | ||
ES | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SK | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
CZ | 26.07.2023 | ||
DK | 26.07.2023 | ||
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RO | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
SM | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
HR | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
LV | 26.07.2023 | ||
PL | 26.07.2023 | ||
RS | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
PT | 27.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 26.07.2023 | |
FI | 26.07.2023 | ||
LT | 26.07.2023 | ||
SE | 26.07.2023 | ||
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | ||
IS | 26.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 26.07.2023 | |
NO | 26.10.2023 | ||
GR | 27.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2011264530 (SANTANGELO BRYAN [US], et al) [A] 1-14* the whole document *; | [A]US9246965 (STOICA ION [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [X]US2016127440 (GORDON MICHAEL [US]) [X] 1-14 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2009328124 (KHOUZAM GILLES [US], et al) [A] 1-18* See paragraphs [0027]-[0042]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2012278619 (TAM KING CHIU [CA]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0042]-[0043]; and claims 1, 19. *; | [A]US2013142499 (MAJOR ROBERT DREW [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0063], [0086]; claims 1, 5; and figure 2. *; | [A]US2014040496 (MOORTHY PRAVEEN N [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0013]-[0022]; and claim 1. *; | [A]US2015180924 (O'CALLAGHAN DANIEL J [US]) [A] 1-18 * See paragraphs [0012]-[0022]; and claim 1. * | by applicant | US9246965 | US2016127440 |