EP3786392 - LINING METHOD AND LINING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-Chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Takao c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 02 /
KURONO, Hayao c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 03 /
DOBARA, Shuhei c/o MITSUBISHI HEAVY INDUSTRIES, LTD., 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2021/09] | Application number, filing date | 19793267.6 | 25.02.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019JP07132 | Priority number, date | JP20180084449 | 25.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018084449 | [2021/09] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019207941 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3786392 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | G21C13/093, G21C19/07, G21C19/06, G21C21/00, B65D90/04 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
G21C21/00 (EP);
E04F13/0862 (US);
B65D90/043 (EP,US);
B65D90/08 (US);
E04B1/167 (US);
E04F13/0889 (US);
G21C13/093 (EP);
G21C19/07 (EP,US);
G21F1/04 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/09] | E04H7/06, E04H7/18, G21C19/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | AUSKLEIDUNGSVERFAHREN UND AUSKLEIDUNG | [2021/09] | English: | LINING METHOD AND LINING | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DOUBLAGE ET DOUBLAGE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.2020 | Translation filed | 19.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 19.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 24.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Divisional application(s) | EP22184626.4 / EP4092686 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.01.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4473974 (ORII SHOICHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * abstract * * columns 3-5 *; | [XA]JPH05172684 (HITACHI LTD) [X] 2,3,5-7 * the whole document * [A] 1,4; | [A]JPH09301488 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-7* the whole document * | International search | [Y]JPS555359 (KAWASAKI HEAVY IND LTD, et al) [Y] 1 * , *; | [Y]JPH05172684 (HITACHI LTD) [Y] 1 * , *; | [A]JPH09301488 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-8* , * | by applicant | JP2004154838 |