EP3784242 - NOVEL PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS OF A PHENOXY DIAMINOPYRIMIDINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.09.2024 | Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065 / US | For all designated states Werthenstein Biopharma GmbH Industrie Nord 1 6105 Werthenstein / CH | [2022/42] |
Former [2021/09] | For all designated states Merck Sharp & Dohme Corp. 126 East Lincoln Road Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | ||
For all designated states Werthenstein Biopharma GmbH Industrie Nord 1 6105 Werthenstein / CH | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MALONEY, Kevin, M. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 02 /
BASU, Kallol 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 03 /
CHUNG, John, Y.L. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 04 /
DESMOND, Richard 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 05 /
DI MASO, Michael James 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 06 /
HUMPHREY, Guy, R. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 07 /
LEE, Alfred, Y. 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 08 /
LEHNHERR, Dan 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 09 /
PENG, Feng 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-02907 / US | 10 /
REN, Hong 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 11 /
WEISEL, Mark 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 12 /
ZHANG, Siwei 126 East Lincoln Avenue Rahway, New Jersey 07065-0907 / US | 13 /
LARPENT, Patrick Industrie Nord 1 6105 Werthenstein / CH | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Merck Sharp & Dohme LLC 120 Moorgate London EC2M 6UR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Hussain, Deeba Merck Sharp & Dohme Limited Hertford Road Hoddesdon Hertfordshire EN11 9BU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19793313.8 | 18.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019US28014 | Priority number, date | US201862661362P | 23.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862661362 P | US201862662991P | 26.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662991 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209607 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3784242 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/505, C07C37/62, C07C37/84, C07D487/08, C07C253/30, C07D239/48 | [2021/51] | CPC: |
C07C37/62 (EP,KR);
C07D239/48 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/4995 (KR);
A61K31/513 (KR);
C07C253/30 (EP,US);
C07C37/84 (EP,KR);
C07C39/27 (KR);
C07C41/09 (US);
C07C41/16 (EP,KR);
C07C41/30 (US);
C07C43/23 (KR);
C07D487/08 (EP,KR);
| C-Set: |
C07C253/30, C07C255/13 (EP);
C07C37/62, C07C39/27 (EP);
C07C37/84, C07C39/27 (EP);
C07C41/16, C07C43/23 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/09] | A61K31/505 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER PHENOXYDIAMINOPYRIMIDIN-VERBINDUNG | [2021/09] | English: | NOVEL PROCESS FOR SYNTHESIS OF A PHENOXY DIAMINOPYRIMIDINE COMPOUND | [2021/09] | French: | NOUVEAU PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE D'UN COMPOSÉ PHÉNOXY DIAMINOPYRIMIDINE | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 23.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 23.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 08.07.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 16.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 16.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 16.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 30.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4422955 (BRYANT ROBERT J [GB]); | [IA]WO2008040652 (HOFFMANN LA ROCHE [CH], et al); | [XP]WO2018118668 (AFFERENT PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al); | International search | [YA]US2009042964 (MALAMAS MICHAEL SOTIRIOS [US], et al); | [A]US9643934 (DVORAK CHARLES ALOIS [US], et al); | [A]US2017326142 (FORD ANTHONY P [US], et al); |