EP3788516 - ENCRYPTION CARD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND ENCRYPTION SERVICE METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALIBABA GROUP HOLDING LIMITED Fourth Floor, One Capital Place P.O. Box 847 George Town, Grand Cayman / KY | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FU, Yingfang Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, 311121 / CN | 02 /
XIAO, Peng Alibaba Group Legal Department 5/F, Building 3, No. 969 West Wen Yi Road Yu Hang District Hangzhou, 311121 / CN | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Patentgruppen A/S Aaboulevarden 31, 4th Floor 8000 Aarhus C / DK | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19793424.3 | 24.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US28989 | Priority number, date | CN201810404346 | 28.04.2018 Original published format: CN201810404346 | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019209997 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3788516 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04L9/08, G06F21/00 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
H04L9/0877 (EP,KR,US);
G06F21/602 (CN,KR);
H04L9/0631 (KR);
H04L9/0643 (KR);
H04L9/0897 (EP,KR,US);
H04L2209/127 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | G06F21/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSKARTE, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND VERSCHLÜSSELUNGSDIENSTVERFAHREN | [2021/10] | English: | ENCRYPTION CARD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND ENCRYPTION SERVICE METHOD | [2021/10] | French: | CARTE DE CHIFFREMENT, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET PROCÉDÉ DE SERVICE DE CHIFFREMENT | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2008005586 (MUNGUIA PETER [US]) [X] 1-15 * abstract * * paragraphs [0008] - [0107] * * figures 1-5 *; | [XI]US2010023747 (ASNAASHARI MEHDI [US], et al) [X] 1,3-12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0001] - [0028] * * figures 1-3 *[I] 2,13-15 | International search | [X]US2008005586 (MUNGUIA PETER [US]) [X] 1-20 * , entire document, especially abstract and para [0023]-[0026], [0035], [0039]-[0041], [0044]-[0051]. *; | [A]US2014068766 (KLUSTAITIS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1-20* , entire document. * | by applicant | US2008005586 | US2010023747 |