EP3797299 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FORMULATING A PERFORMANCE METRIC OF A MOTION OF A SWIMMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Omnibus 157 Pty Limited Suite 2, Level 3 7-15 Macquarie Place Sydney, NSW 2000 / AU | [2021/43] |
Former [2021/13] | For all designated states Sensarii Pty Ltd 115 Mullens Street Balmain, New South Wales 2041 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FATHALLAH, Michel 147 Belmont Road Glenfield, New South Wales 2167 / AU | 02 /
POTAS, Michael 87 River Street Earlwood, New South Wales 2206 / AU | 03 /
MAY, Stuart 55 Metropolitan Road Enmore, New South Wales 2042 / AU | [2021/13] | Representative(s) | Cummings, Sean Patrick, et al Keltie LLP No.1 London Bridge London SE1 9BA / GB | [2021/13] | Application number, filing date | 19793596.8 | 26.04.2019 | [2021/13] | WO2019AU50370 | Priority number, date | AU20180901377 | 26.04.2018 Original published format: AU 2018901377 | [2021/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019204876 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3797299 | Date: | 31.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q10/06 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
G06Q10/0639 (EP,KR);
A63B24/0062 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A63B24/0006 (EP,KR,US);
A63B31/02 (AU,US);
A63B31/10 (EP,US);
A63B69/12 (EP,AU,KR,US);
G01P15/02 (AU,KR);
A63B2071/0658 (EP,KR);
A63B2220/16 (EP,KR);
A63B2220/40 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A63B2220/44 (EP,KR);
A63B2220/51 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A63B2220/56 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A63B2220/803 (EP,KR);
A63B2220/836 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A63B2225/50 (EP,AU,KR);
A63B2225/60 (AU,KR);
A63B2244/20 (KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2021/13] | G01P15/00, A61B5/00, A63B69/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/13] | Title | German: | SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR FORMULIERUNG EINER LEISTUNGSMETRIK EINER BEWEGUNG EINES SCHWIMMERS | [2021/13] | English: | SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR FORMULATING A PERFORMANCE METRIC OF A MOTION OF A SWIMMER | [2021/13] | French: | SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FORMULATION D'UNE MESURE DE PERFORMANCE D'UN MOUVEMENT D'UN NAGEUR | [2021/13] | Entry into regional phase | 26.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 26.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/13] | 01.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2010090867 (SWIMSENSE LLC [US], et al) [Y] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraph [0014] * * paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] * * paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0052] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0083] * * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0109] - paragraph [0133] *; | [Y]US2017128808 (AUVINEN ARI [FI]) [Y] 11 * abstract ** paragraph [0057] *; | [Y] - MAGALHAES FABRICIO ANICIO DE ET AL, "Wearable inertial sensors in swimming motion analysis: a systematic review", JOURNAL OF SPORTS SCIENCES, GB, vol. 33, no. 7, doi:10.1080/02640414.2014.962574, ISSN 0264-0414, (20150421), pages 732 - 745, URL: https://www.researchgate.net/profile/Fabricio-Magalhaes/publication/267642711_Wearable_inertial_sensors_in_swimming_motion_analysis_A_systematic_review/links/5461f6e60cf27487b4547b04/Wearable-inertial-sensors-in-swimming-motion-analysis-A-systematic-review.pdf, XP055874275 [Y] 1-16 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1080/02640414.2014.962574 | International search | [X]US2010210975 (ANTHONY III JOHN J [US], et al) [X] 1-36 * title, abstract; fig.1,2; par.0014-0015, 0030-0037, 0042, 0055, 0068, 0114, 0118, 0124 *; | [X]US2017061817 (METTLER MAY BERENICE [US]) [X] 1-6, 9-36 * title, abstract; par.0019, 0239, 0427, 0503-0506 *; | [X]US2017128808 (AUVINEN ARI [FI]) [X] 1-6, 9-36* title, abstract; fig.1; par.0007-0016 * |