EP3812456 - GROWTH INHIBITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.09.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Orizuru Therapeutics, Inc. 26-1, Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi Kanagawa 251-8555 / JP | [2023/10] |
Former [2021/17] | For all designated states Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | ||
For all designated states Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0045 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAZOE, Noriko c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 26-1, Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 02 /
HIYOSHI, Hideyuki c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 26-1, Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 03 /
MOCHIDA, Taisuke c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 26-1, Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 04 /
ITO, Ryo c/o Takeda Pharmaceutical Company Limited 26-1, Muraoka-Higashi 2-chome Fujisawa-shi, Kanagawa 251-0012 / JP | 05 /
TOYODA, Taro c/o Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | 06 /
KIMURA, Azuma c/o Kyoto University 36-1, Yoshida-honmachi Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8501 / JP | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 2 London Bridge London SE1 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Jones, Nicholas Andrew Withers & Rogers LLP 4 More London Riverside London, SE1 2AU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19793629.7 | 22.04.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019JP17044 | Priority number, date | JP20180082606 | 23.04.2018 Original published format: JP 2018082606 | [2021/17] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019208505 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/44] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3812456 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 31.10.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C12N5/077, C12N5/071, A61K35/39 | [2022/02] | CPC: |
C12N5/0676 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K35/39 (EP,KR,US);
C12N5/0678 (EP);
C12N2500/38 (EP);
C12N2501/113 (EP,IL,KR);
C12N2501/119 (US);
C12N2501/155 (EP);
C12N2501/70 (EP);
C12N2501/727 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | C12N5/077 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Extension states | BA | 20.11.2020 | ME | 20.11.2020 | Title | German: | WACHSTUMSINHIBITOR | [2021/17] | English: | GROWTH INHIBITOR | [2021/17] | French: | INHIBITEUR DE CROISSANCE | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 20.11.2020 | Translation filed | 20.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 20.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 05.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2005069529 (BONNER-WEIR SUSAN [US], et al) [X] 12-14 * paragraph [0196] *; | [XI]US2014141509 (GADUE PAUL [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7 * figure 4; example 1 * [I] 3-6,8-14; | [XI] - YZUMI YAMASHITA-SUGAHARA ET AL, "An inhibitor of fibroblast growth factor receptor-1 (FGFR1) promotes late-stage terminal differentiation from NGN3+ pancreatic endocrine progenitors", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, (20161027), vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep35908, pages 1 - 14, XP055646902 [X] 1,2,5,8,9,11 * figures 3,5, S3, S4 * [I] 3,4,6,7,10,12-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep35908 | [A] - RISULEO GIANFRANCO ET AL, "The synthetic inhibitor of Fibroblast Growth Factor Receptor PD166866 controls negatively the growth of tumor cells in culture", JOURNAL OF EXPERIMENTAL & CLINICAL CANCER RESEARCH, BIOMED CENTRAL LTD, LONDON UK, (20091211), vol. 28, no. 1, ISSN 1756-9966, page 151, XP021070228 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * | [A] - WAGNER ET AL, "Suppression of fibroblast growth factor receptor signaling inhibits pancreatic cancer growth in vitro and in vivo", GASTROENTEROLOGY, ELSEVIER INC, US, (19980401), vol. 114, no. 4, doi:10.1016/S0016-5085(98)70594-3, ISSN 0016-5085, pages 798 - 807, XP005138788 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0016-5085(98)70594-3 | [A] - ALIREZA REZANIA ET AL, "Reversal of diabetes with insulin-producing cells derived in vitro from human pluripotent stem cells", NATURE BIOTECHNOLOGY, (20140911), vol. 32, no. 11, doi:10.1038/nbt.3033, ISSN 1087-0156, pages 1121 - 1133, XP055200937 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nbt.3033 | [A] - LIU ZHANBING ET AL, "Identification of a Fibroblast Growth Factor Receptor 1 Splice Variant That Inhibits Pancreatic Cancer Cell Growth", CANCER RESEARCH, US, vol. 67, no. 6, doi:10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3843, ISSN 0008-5472, (20070315), pages 2712 - 2719, URL: https://cancerres.aacrjournals.org/content/67/6/2712.full-text.pdf, (20211130), XP055867281 [A] 1-14 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1158/0008-5472.CAN-06-3843 | International search | [X]US2005069529 (BONNER-WEIR SUSAN [US], et al) [X] 12-14* , [0196] & WO 2000/078929 A1 & EP 1185622 A1 *; | [X]JP2014519854 [X] 1-14 * , [0013], [0065] & US 2014/0141509 A1 Claims, [0027], [0076] & WO 2012/178215 A1 & EP 2723851 A1 *; | [X] - YAMASHITA-SUGAHARA YZUMI et al, "An inhibitor of fibroblast growth factor receptor-1 (FGFR1) promotes late-stage terminal differentiation from NGN3+ pancreatic endocrine progenitors.", Scientific Reports, vol. 6, no. 1, doi:10.1038/srep35908, pages 15 - 10, XP055646902 [X] 1-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep35908 | by applicant | WO9615128 | WO2007069666 | US2008233610 | WO2008118220 | WO2008124133 | JP2008283972 | WO2008151058 | JP2008307007 | WO2009006930 | WO2009006997 | WO2009007852 | WO2009012428 | US2009047263 | WO2010010902 | WO2010032242 | WO2011154941 | WO2016021734 | JP2018082606 | - Scientific Reports, (20160000), vol. 6 | - The journal of Pharmacology and Experimental Therapeutics, (19980700), vol. 286, no. 1, pages 569 - 577 | - CAS , no. 1218779-75-9 | - TAKAHASHI KYAMANAKA S., Cell, (20060000), vol. 126, pages 663 - 676 | - TAKAHASHI KYAMANAKA S. et al., Cell, (20070000), vol. 131, pages 861 - 872 | - OKITA, K.ICHISAKA, T.YAMANAKA, S., Nature, (20070000), vol. 451, pages 141 - 146 | - HUANGFU D.MELTON, DA. et al., Nature Biotechnology, (20080000), vol. 26, no. 7, pages 795 - 797 | - OKITA K et al., Nat. Methods, (20110500), vol. 8, no. 5, pages 409 - 12 | - OKITA K et al., Stem Cells, vol. 31, no. 3, pages 458 - 66 | - YU J.THOMSON JA. et al., Science, (20070000), vol. 318, pages 1917 - 1920 | - SHI Y.DING S. et al., Cell Stem Cell, (20080000), vol. 3, pages 568 - 574 | - KIM JB.SCHOLER HR. et al., Nature, (20080000), vol. 454, pages 646 - 650 | - TOYODA et al., Stem cell Research, (20150000), vol. 14, pages 185 - 197 | - Nature Biotechnology, (20140000), vol. 32, pages 1121 - 1133 | - Stem Cell Research, (20150000), vol. 14, pages 185 - 197 |