EP3784535 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING FUELING OPERATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.01.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tanku Ltd. 97 Beit lechem St. 3556852 Haifa / IL | [2021/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VALDHORN, Dan 97 Beit Lechem St. 3556852 Haifa / IL | 02 /
MAOZ, Nadav 7 Volcani bvd. 7640320 Rehovot / IL | 03 /
AMSTER, Alon 5 Kikar Harakafot St. 3474905 Haifa / IL | [2021/09] | Representative(s) | Turner, Craig Robert, et al AA Thornton IP LLP 8th Floor, 125 Old Broad Street London EC2N 1AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/09] | Turner, Craig Robert, et al A.A. Thornton & Co. Octagon Point 5 Cheapside London EC2V 6AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 19793687.5 | 24.04.2019 | [2021/09] | WO2019IB53377 | Priority number, date | US201862662520P | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662520 P | US201862662539P | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662539 P | US201862662561P | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662561 P | US201862662569P | 25.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862662569 P | US201862698555P | 16.07.2018 Original published format: US 201862698555 P | [2021/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019207499 | Date: | 31.10.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3784535 | Date: | 03.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 31.10.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 05.12.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B60S5/02, G05D1/00, G06Q10/06, G07C5/00 | [2021/09] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0185 (EP,US);
B60S5/02 (US);
B67D7/0401 (US);
B67D7/145 (US);
G06F18/22 (US);
G06Q50/06 (EP,US);
G06T7/73 (US);
G06V10/764 (EP,US);
G06V10/82 (EP,US);
G06V20/00 (US);
G06V20/20 (US);
G06V20/52 (EP,US);
G07B15/00 (EP);
G07C5/008 (US);
H04N7/18 (US);
H04N7/188 (EP);
B67D2007/0442 (US);
B67D2007/0463 (US);
B67D2007/0473 (US);
G06T2207/30232 (US);
G06T2207/30252 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/09] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR DURCHFÜHRUNG VON BETANKUNGSOPERATIONEN | [2021/09] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR PERFORMING FUELING OPERATIONS | [2021/09] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR LA RÉALISATION D'OPÉRATIONS DE RAVITAILLEMENT EN CARBURANT | [2021/09] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/09] | 14.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6024137 (STRNAD RUDOLPH A [US], et al) [Y] 3,5 * column 3, line 55 - line 64 *; | [Y]US2006196571 (KASSNER UWE [DE]) [Y] 5* paragraph [0009] *; | [Y]US9881432 (MCQUADE CHARLES MICHAEL [US], et al) [Y] 3,5 * page 6, line 14 - line 34 * * page 7, line 11 - line 58 *; | [E]EP3525160 (GALBIT ELECTRONICS LTD [IL], et al) [E] 3,5 * paragraphs [0031] , [ 0079]; claim 1 * | International search | [XY]WO2006005953 (IVES ANDREW PETER [GB], et al) [X] 1-6, 9, 10, 12, 13, 21, 22 * entire document * [Y] 7, 8; | [A]US2010191674 (CONDON KEVIN J [US]) [A] 1-22* entire document *; | [A]US2015242855 (VILNAI YOAV [IL]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]US2018052467 (DUDAR AED M [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [A]WO2018052416 (FORD MOTOR CO [US]) [A] 1-22 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018106654 (KIM DAEBUM [KR], et al) [Y] 7, 8 * entire document * |