EP3853041 - RUBBER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYPHENOLIC COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 25.06.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.03.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COMPAGNIE GENERALE DES ETABLISSEMENTS MICHELIN 23 place des Carmes Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2021/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
THUILLIEZ, Anne-Lise Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux Service juridique PI CBS/CORP/J/PI F35 - Site de Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
GAVARD-LONCHAY, Odile Manufacture Francaise Des Pneumatiques Michelin 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux Service juridique PI CBS/CORP/J/PI F35 - Site de Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2021/30] | Representative(s) | M.F.P. Michelin DCJ/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/30] | Louret, Sylvain M.F.P. MICHELIN Service juridique - Propriété Intellectuelle DCJ/PI - F35 - Site de Ladoux 23, place des Carmes - Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | Application number, filing date | 19794593.4 | 13.09.2019 | [2021/30] | WO2019FR52139 | Priority number, date | FR20180058590 | 21.09.2018 Original published format: FR 1858590 | [2021/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020058613 | Date: | 26.03.2020 | Language: | FR | [2020/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3853041 | Date: | 28.07.2021 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.03.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B60C1/00, C08K5/13 | [2021/30] | CPC: |
C08K5/13 (EP);
C08L7/00 (US);
B60C1/00 (EP);
B60C1/0041 (EP,US);
B60C1/0016 (EP);
B60C2001/0066 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08K5/13, C08L21/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/30] | Title | German: | KAUTSCHUKZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINER POLYPHENOLISCHEN VERBINDUNG | [2021/30] | English: | RUBBER COMPOSITION COMPRISING A POLYPHENOLIC COMPOUND | [2021/30] | French: | COMPOSITION DE CAOUTCHOUC COMPRENANT UN COMPOSE POLYPHENOLIQUE | [2021/30] | Entry into regional phase | 21.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/30] | 21.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]JP2000160479 ; | [X]CN102746543 ; | [Y]WO2014095585 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 1-15 * paragraph [0102]; claim -; table 1 *; | [X]KR20140126489 (HANKOOK TIRE CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1-7,10-12,14,15 * paragraphs [0023] , [0 76]; examples 1-8; tables 1-2 *; | [XDY]WO2017081387 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR], et al) [XD] 1,5-15 * page 4, lines 28-30; claims 1-9, 13, 15, 20, 24, 29, 30, 33, 35, 36 * * page 4, line 40 - page 5, line 10 *[Y] 1-15; | [X]CN107652558 (ZHOU LI) [X] 1-11 * abstract *; | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2000, no. 53, Database accession no. 2000-567359, XP002791579 & JP2000160479 A 20000613 (TORAY IND INC) [X] 1-7,10,11,14,15 * exemple comparatif 1; paragraph [0030]; example 1 * | [X] - DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2013, no. 56, Database accession no. 2013-B52391, XP002791580 & CN102746543 A 20121024 (SHANDONG QIMEIDA TIRE CO LTD) [X] 1-7,10,11,14 * abstract * | by applicant | EP0247580 | US5576080 | EP0763564 | WO9736724 | WO9916600 | WO9928376 | WO0073372 | WO0210269 | WO02053634 | WO03016215 | WO03016387 | US2003120007 | US6610261 | WO2004003067 | EP1403287 | US6747087 | WO2004056915 | US6903165 | WO2006069792 | WO2006069793 | WO2008003434 | WO2008003435 | US2011098404 | WO2011092124 | JP2011252107 | WO2014095582 | WO2017064091 | WO2017081387 | WO2017081388 | WO2017103387 | - J. Appl. Polym. Sci., (19990000), vol. 73, page 1733 | - Macromolécules, (19980000), vol. 31, page 2822 | - The Journal of the American Chemical Society, (19380200), vol. 60, page 309 |