EP3874181 - TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES WITH REVERSE DRIVE AND MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING THE TRANSMISSION UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.09.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | [2024/15] |
Former [2021/36] | For all designated states PIAGGIO & C. S.p.A. Via Rinaldo Piaggio 25 56025 Pontedera (Pisa) / IT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESTI, Paolo c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.P.A. Viale Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | 02 /
DOVERI, Stefano c/o PIAGGIO & C. S.P.A. Via Rinaldo Piaggio, 25 56025 Pontedera (PI) / IT | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Mannucci, Michele, et al Ufficio Tecnico Ing. A. Mannucci S.r.l. Via della Scala, 4 50123 Firenze / IT | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19794703.9 | 28.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019IB59214 | Priority number, date | IT20180009928 | 30.10.2018 Original published format: IT201800009928 | [2021/36] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020089766 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3874181 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3874181 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | F16H63/30, B62M23/02, B62M25/08, B62M7/04 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
F16H63/302 (EP,IL,US);
B62M23/02 (EP,IL,US);
B62M25/08 (EP,IL,US);
B62M7/04 (EP,IL,US);
F16H61/16 (US);
B60Y2200/126 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2021/36] | F16H63/30, B62M25/00, B62M23/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GETRIEBEEINHEIT FÜR KRAFTFAHRZEUGE MIT RÜCKWÄRTSGANG UND KRAFTFAHRZEUG MIT DER GETRIEBEEINHEIT | [2021/36] | English: | TRANSMISSION UNIT FOR MOTOR VEHICLES WITH REVERSE DRIVE AND MOTOR VEHICLE COMPRISING THE TRANSMISSION UNIT | [2021/36] | French: | UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION POUR VÉHICULES À MOTEUR À ENTRAÎNEMENT EN MARCHE ARRIÈRE ET VÉHICULE À MOTEUR COMPRENANT L'UNITÉ DE TRANSMISSION | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 20.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 20.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 20.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 15.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HR | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | HR | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | NO | 21.05.2024 | |
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Cited in | International search | [I]US4763538 (FUJITA HARUYASU [JP], et al); | [Y]DE4135215 (ZAHNRADFABRIK FRIEDRICHSHAFEN [DE]); | [YA]WO2005077694 (AVL LIST GMBH [AT], et al); | [IY]EP2604459 (AISIN SEIKI [JP]) |