EP3870251 - DIALYSIS MACHINE FOR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 02.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fresenius Medical Care Deutschland GmbH Else-Kröner-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE | [2021/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRIESSMANN, Erik Karl-Brand-Strasse 14 97422 Schweinfurt / DE | 02 /
RATHKE-SCHLAEFER, Bettina Emminghausstr. 43 61250 Usingen / DE | [2021/35] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2021/35] | Application number, filing date | 19795141.1 | 22.10.2019 | [2021/35] | WO2019EP78662 | Priority number, date | DE201810126817 | 26.10.2018 Original published format: DE102018126817 | [2021/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020083877 | Date: | 30.04.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/18] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3870251 | Date: | 01.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M1/28 | [2021/35] | CPC: |
A61M1/282 (EP,US);
A61M1/28 (US);
A61M1/285 (US);
A61M1/287 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/35] | Title | German: | DIALYSEGERÄT FÜR DIE PERITONEALDIALYSE | [2021/35] | English: | DIALYSIS MACHINE FOR PERITONEAL DIALYSIS | [2021/35] | French: | APPAREIL DE DIALYSE POUR DIALYSE PÉRITONÉALE | [2021/35] | Entry into regional phase | 27.04.2021 | National basic fee paid | 27.04.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.04.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.04.2021 | Examination requested [2021/35] | 27.04.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6558343 (NEFTEL FREDERIC [CH]) [I] 1-10 * column 1, line 66 - column 2, line 2 * * column 2, line 26 - line 32 * * column 2, line 47 - line 59 * * claim 9 *; | [A]US2012071815 (CHILDERS ROBERT W [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1,16,23 *; | [I]DE102011105916 (FRESENIUS MEDICAL CARE DE GMBH [DE]) [I] 1 * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0027] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0034] * | by applicant | WO2010088360 | WO2013000569 |