|
29.07.2024 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.09.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.05.2023 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
44 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.07.2021 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2021 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
21.06.2021 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2021 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2021 |
Invitation to file observations regarding restoration of priority right |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.04.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.04.2021 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.04.2021 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
26.04.2021 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
19.02.2021 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
28.05.2020 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
91 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.04.2020 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
71 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
03.12.2019 |
Notification relating to priority claim |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
12.11.2019 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Abstract |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Annex |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Claims |
International Searching Authority |
9 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Description |
International Searching Authority |
45 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Drawings |
International Searching Authority |
15 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Invitation to Correct Defects in the International Application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Invitation to Correct Priority Claim (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
5 |
|
30.10.2019 |
Submission concerning representation |
International Searching Authority |
1 |