Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP3864775
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
13.09.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.07.2024 |
Change - representative |
|
02.10.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.09.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.06.2023 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
26.05.2023 |
First examination report |
|
16.09.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.12.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.12.2021 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
17.12.2021 |
Change - extension states |
published on 19.01.2022 [2022/03] |
29.09.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.07.2021 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
16.07.2021 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
16.07.2021 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 18.08.2021 [2021/33] |
22.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.06.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
11.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
04.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
01.05.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
01.05.2021 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
18.04.2020 |
New entry: applicant or inventor |
|
08.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|