Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11012157 | Global Dossier | 18.05.2021 | B2 | US2020322056 | 08.10.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016909782 | 23.06.2020 | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA3116223 | Global Dossier | 23.04.2024 | C | CA3116223 | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 | WO2019US56320 | 15.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3864775 | Global Dossier | 18.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 | WO2019US56320 | 15.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112021006984 | 20.07.2021 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 | WO2019US56320 | 15.10.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020077362 | Global Dossier | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10727949 | Global Dossier | 28.07.2020 | B2 | US2020119811 | 16.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201862745254 | 12.10.2018 | US201816237358 | 31.12.2018 |