EP3787726 - SLEEP PHASE DEPENDENT TEMPERATURE CONTROL AND LEARNING METHODS TO OPTIMIZE SLEEP QUALITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bryte, Inc. 1060 Via Del Pozo Los Altos, CA 94022 / US | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TSERN, Ely 1060 Via Del Pozo Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 02 /
WALKER, Matthew 1060 Via Del Pozo Los Altos, California 94022 / US | 03 /
FARRINGDON, Jonathan 1060 Via Del Pozo Los Altos, California 94022 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Derry, Paul Stefan, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2021/10] | Application number, filing date | 19796214.5 | 01.05.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US30293 | Priority number, date | US201862665278P | 01.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862665278 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019213329 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787726 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3787726 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.05.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61M21/02, A47C21/04, A61B5/00, A61M21/00 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
A47C21/044 (EP);
A47C21/04 (US);
A47C21/003 (EP);
A47C21/048 (EP);
A61M21/02 (EP,US);
G05B13/0265 (US);
G05D23/1902 (US);
G05D23/1904 (EP);
A61B2562/0247 (EP);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A61B5/0816 (EP);
A61B5/1113 (EP,US);
A61B5/4809 (EP,US);
A61B5/4812 (EP,US);
A61M2021/0066 (EP);
A61M2021/0083 (EP);
A61M2205/18 (EP);
A61M2205/332 (EP);
A61M2205/3368 (EP);
A61M2205/3553 (EP);
A61M2205/3569 (EP);
A61M2205/3584 (EP);
A61M2205/3592 (EP);
A61M2205/3606 (EP);
A61M2205/362 (EP);
A61M2205/3673 (EP);
A61M2205/505 (EP);
A61M2205/581 (EP);
A61M2205/582 (EP);
A61M2205/583 (EP);
A61M2205/587 (EP);
A61M2205/588 (EP);
A61M2209/088 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLAFPHASENABHÄNGIGE TEMPERATURREGELUNG UND LERNVERFAHREN ZUR OPTIMIERUNG DER SCHLAFQUALITÄT | [2021/10] | English: | SLEEP PHASE DEPENDENT TEMPERATURE CONTROL AND LEARNING METHODS TO OPTIMIZE SLEEP QUALITY | [2021/10] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE RÉGULATION ET D'APPRENTISSAGE DE TEMPÉRATURE DÉPENDANT DE LA PHASE DE SOMMEIL AFIN D'OPTIMISER LA QUALITÉ DU SOMMEIL | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 01.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 01.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.12.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 28.04.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | ES | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | IT | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2024/08] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
MC | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
ES | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2003010230 (NIPPON RIKO IGAKU KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0045]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]US2016136385 (SCORCIONI RUGGERO [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0186]; figures 1-7 *; | [A]KR20170095649 (LG HOUSEHOLD & HEALTH CARE LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0087]; figures 1-5 * | International search | [A]JP2014042773 (SLEEP SYSTEM KENKYUSHO KK) [A] 1-52 * See the whole document. *; | [X]US2016136385 (SCORCIONI RUGGERO [US]) [X] 1-52 * See abstract; paragraphs [0027]-[0032], [0072]-[0077], [0086]-[0087], [0094], [0101]-[0103], [0110], [0115]-[0156], [0161], [0164]-[0180], [0194]-[0198]; claims 1-20; figures 1-7. *; | [A]US2016361515 (JUNG HYUNKI [KR], et al) [A] 1-52 * See the whole document. *; | [A]WO2018023135 (FORTY/W INC [US]) [A] 1-52 * See the whole document. *; | [A] - SHEN, T.-Y. et al., "Comparison of Sleep Quality and Thermal Comfort for Innovative Mattress Design", Procedia Manufacturing, (20150000), vol. 3, doi:10.1016/j.promfg.2015.07.893, ISSN 2351-9789, pages 5874 - 5880, XP055648730 [A] 1-52 * See the whole document. * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.promfg.2015.07.893 | by applicant | - J. KELLY et al., "Recent Developments in Home Sleep-Monitoring Devices", ISRN Neurology, vol. 2012 |