EP3760651 - ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.05.2023 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 04.12.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2021/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GWAK, Rae Keun LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
JUNG, Seung Hwan LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
GONG, Jin Sam LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JUN, Jung Ho LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
LEE, Choong Hoon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 06 /
LEE, Eun Jung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 07 /
JU, Hyun Jin LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 08 /
PARK, In Sung LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 09 /
PARK, Sang Eun LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/01] | Application number, filing date | 19796262.4 | 03.05.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019KR05362 | Priority number, date | KR20180052046 | 04.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180052046 | [2021/01] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212303 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3760651 | Date: | 06.01.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/01] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3760651 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2/38, C08F4/6592, C08F4/649, C09J123/08 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
C09J123/0815 (EP,KR,US);
C08F210/16 (EP,KR,US);
C08F2/38 (KR);
C08F210/14 (EP,KR);
C08F4/6495 (KR);
C08F4/6496 (KR);
C08F4/6592 (KR);
C08L23/0815 (KR);
C08F2500/17 (KR,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ETHYLEN/ALPHA-OLEFIN-COPOLYMER UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2021/01] | English: | ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR | [2021/01] | French: | COPOLYMÈRE D'ÉTHYLÈNE-ACÉTATE DE VINYLE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION | [2021/01] | Entry into regional phase | 28.09.2020 | Translation filed | 28.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 28.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.09.2020 | Examination requested [2021/01] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.05.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 12.05.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 12.05.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 30.03.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 29.06.2022 | AT | 29.06.2022 | CZ | 29.06.2022 | DK | 29.06.2022 | EE | 29.06.2022 | FI | 29.06.2022 | HR | 29.06.2022 | LT | 29.06.2022 | LV | 29.06.2022 | MC | 29.06.2022 | PL | 29.06.2022 | RO | 29.06.2022 | RS | 29.06.2022 | SE | 29.06.2022 | SI | 29.06.2022 | SK | 29.06.2022 | SM | 29.06.2022 | BG | 29.09.2022 | NO | 29.09.2022 | GR | 30.09.2022 | IS | 29.10.2022 | PT | 31.10.2022 | [2024/09] |
Former [2023/37] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SI | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
CZ | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/21] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
DK | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 29.06.2022 | |
AT | 29.06.2022 | ||
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
IS | 29.10.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
PL | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
EE | 29.06.2022 | ||
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RO | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
SK | 29.06.2022 | ||
SM | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
PT | 31.10.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 29.06.2022 | |
FI | 29.06.2022 | ||
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
RS | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
HR | 29.06.2022 | ||
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
LV | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
BG | 29.09.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | ||
GR | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | FI | 29.06.2022 | |
LT | 29.06.2022 | ||
SE | 29.06.2022 | ||
NO | 29.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015045526 (KUM DON-HO [KR], et al) [I] 1-9 * abstract * * examples 1-5; table 2 * * figure 1 ** paragraph [0082] *; | [A]EP3216795 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-9 * tables 1,2 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0112] - [0124] * | International search | [A]KR20070112794 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-9; | [A]KR20100126712 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US])[A] 1-9; | [Y]KR101097378B (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-9; | [A]US2012196985 (LEE YONG-HO [US], et al) [A] 1-9; | [Y]KR20160054849 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-9 | by applicant | US4935474 | US5914289 | KR20030012308 | US6828394 | US6841631 | US6894128 |