EP3758373 - VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/01] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
[2023/29] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.07.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.11.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.08.2024 [2024/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [2023/38] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states TENCENT TECHNOLOGY (SHENZHEN) COMPANY LIMITED 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hongshun 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2021/01] | Representative(s) | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | [2023/38] |
Former [2021/01] | EP&C P.O. Box 3241 2280 GE Rijswijk / NL | Application number, filing date | 19796418.2 | 03.04.2019 | [2021/01] | WO2019CN81239 | Priority number, date | CN201810413949 | 03.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810413949 | [2021/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019210760 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3758373 | Date: | 30.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/53] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3758373 | Date: | 20.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/147, H04N19/186, H04N19/11, H04N19/119, H04N19/196 | [2021/17] | CPC: |
H04N19/11 (EP);
H04N19/159 (US);
H04N19/103 (CN);
H04N19/119 (EP);
H04N19/122 (CN,US);
H04N19/147 (EP,CN);
H04N19/186 (EP,US);
H04N19/197 (EP);
H04N19/567 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/01] | H04N19/11, H04N19/147, H04N19/186 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/01] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2023/29] | English: | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2023/29] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2023/29] |
Former [2021/01] | VIDEOCODIERUNGSVERFAHREN, VIDEOCODIERUNGSVORRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/01] | VIDEO ENCODING METHOD, VIDEO ENCODING APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE, AND STORAGE MEDIUM | ||
Former [2021/01] | PROCÉDÉ DE CODAGE VIDÉO, APPAREIL DE CODAGE VIDÉO, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | Translation filed | 22.09.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Search fee paid | 22.09.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.09.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.09.2020 | Examination requested [2020/53] | 14.10.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 15.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 15.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 21.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.09.2023 | CZ | 20.09.2023 | DK | 20.09.2023 | EE | 20.09.2023 | ES | 20.09.2023 | FI | 20.09.2023 | HR | 20.09.2023 | IT | 20.09.2023 | LT | 20.09.2023 | LV | 20.09.2023 | NL | 20.09.2023 | PL | 20.09.2023 | RO | 20.09.2023 | RS | 20.09.2023 | SE | 20.09.2023 | SK | 20.09.2023 | SM | 20.09.2023 | NO | 20.12.2023 | GR | 21.12.2023 | IS | 20.01.2024 | PT | 22.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
IT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
PL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 20.09.2023 | |
CZ | 20.09.2023 | ||
EE | 20.09.2023 | ||
ES | 20.09.2023 | ||
FI | 20.09.2023 | ||
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RO | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SK | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
PT | 22.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
SM | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
IS | 20.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
NL | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
HR | 20.09.2023 | ||
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
LV | 20.09.2023 | ||
RS | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 20.09.2023 | |
LT | 20.09.2023 | ||
SE | 20.09.2023 | ||
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 20.09.2023 | |
NO | 20.12.2023 | ||
GR | 21.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY] - ABRAMOWSKI ANDRZEJ ED ET AL, "A survey over possible intra prediction optimizations in the H.265/HEVC encoder", PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE; [PROCEEDINGS OF SPIE ISSN 0277-786X VOLUME 10524], SPIE, US, (20160928), vol. 10031, doi:10.1117/12.2249338, ISBN 978-1-5106-1533-5, pages 1003153 - 1003153, XP060073637 [X] 1,13-15 * abstract * * Sections 3, 4 * [A] 4-8 [Y] 2,3,9-12 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.2249338 | [Y] - JAEHWAN KIM ET AL, "Fast intra mode decision of HEVC based on hierarchical structure", 8TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON INFORMATION, COMMUNICATIONS AND SIGNAL PROCESSING (ICICS) 2011 , IEEE, (20111213), doi:10.1109/ICICS.2011.6174215, ISBN 978-1-4577-0029-3, pages 1 - 4, XP032178592 [Y] 2,3,9-12 * abstract * * Sections I and III * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICICS.2011.6174215 | [A] - GU JIAWEN ET AL, "A novel satd based fast intra prediction for HEVC", 2017 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON IMAGE PROCESSING (ICIP), IEEE, (20170917), doi:10.1109/ICIP.2017.8296565, pages 1667 - 1671, XP033322858 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICIP.2017.8296565 | [A] - ZHOU XIN ET AL, "Visual saliency-based fast intracoding algorithm for high efficiency video coding", JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC IMAGING, S P I E - INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING, US, vol. 26, no. 1, doi:10.1117/1.JEI.26.1.013019, ISSN 1017-9909, (20170101), page 13019, (20170222), XP060082806 [A] 1-15 * abstract * * Section 3.3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/1.JEI.26.1.013019 | International search | [A]US2013101029 (SRINIVASAN RANGA RAMANUJAM [IN], et al) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [Y]CN103338371 (EAST CHINA INST TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs 0006-0046, and figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2015063452 (KIM IG KYUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-23* entire document *; | [Y]CN104954788 (ZHEJIANG DAHUA TECHNOLOGY CO) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs 0023-0107, and figures 1-7 *; | [Y]CN105657420 (BANGYAN TECH CO LTD) [Y] 1-23 * description, paragraphs 0040-0113, and figures 1-3 *; | [A]CN105791863 (UNIV XIDIAN) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [A]CN106131548 (TONGGUAN SCIENCE & TECH (SHENZHEN) CO LTD) [A] 1-23 * entire document *; | [Y] - Huang, Jianqiu; He, Xiaohai; Li, Yuan; Qing, Linbo, "Fast Decision Algorithm for Intra Mode Based on HEVC", Video Engineering, (20140802), vol. 38, no. 15, doi:10.16280/j.videoe.2014.15.016, pages 6 - 8, XP009523495 [Y] 1-23 * , and figures 1 and 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.16280/j.videoe.2014.15.016 |