EP3715389 - ADHESIVE COMPOSITION INCLUDING ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/40] | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ETHYLENE/& X3B1;-OLEFIN COPOLYMER | ||
[2023/02] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.04.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 04.01.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG CHEM, LTD. 128, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07336 / KR | [2020/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GWAK, Rae Keun LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Eun Jung LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 03 /
GONG, Jin Sam LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 04 /
JUN, Jung Ho LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 05 /
KIM, Tae Su LG Chem Research Park 188, Munji-ro Yuseong-gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2020/40] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/40] | Application number, filing date | 19796559.3 | 03.05.2019 | [2020/40] | WO2019KR05371 | Priority number, date | KR20180052043 | 04.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180052043 | KR20180052046 | 04.05.2018 Original published format: KR 20180052046 | [2020/40] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212310 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3715389 | Date: | 30.09.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3715389 | Date: | 17.05.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09J123/08, C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2/38, C08F4/6592, C08F4/649, C08L23/08 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
C09J123/0815 (EP,US);
C08F2/34 (US);
C08F2/38 (EP);
C08F210/16 (EP,US);
C08F4/649 (EP);
C08F4/6592 (EP,US);
C08L23/08 (EP);
C09J11/08 (US);
C09J123/08 (EP);
C09J123/16 (US);
C08F2420/02 (EP);
C08F2420/06 (EP);
C08F4/65908 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08F210/16, C08F4/6592 (EP);
C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2500/02, C08F2500/03, C08F2500/08, C08F2500/12, C08F2500/17, C08F2500/33, C08F2500/34 (EP) |
Former IPC [2020/40] | C08F210/16, C08F210/14, C08F2/38, C08F4/6592, C08F4/649, C08L23/08, C09J123/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/40] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM ETHYLEN/ALPHA-OLEFIN-COPOLYMER | [2023/02] | English: | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION INCLUDING ETHYLENE/ALPHA-OLEFIN COPOLYMER | [2023/02] | French: | COMPOSITION ADHÈSIVE CONTENANT UN COPOLYMÈRE D'ETHYLÈNE/ALPHA-OLÈFINE | [2023/02] |
Former [2020/40] | KLEBSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM ETHYLEN-/X3B1-OLEFIN-COPOLYMER | ||
Former [2020/40] | ADHESIVE COMPOSITION COMPRISING ETHYLENE/& X3B1;-OLEFIN COPOLYMER | ||
Former [2020/40] | COMPOSITION ADH& XC9;SIVE CONTENANT UN COPOLYM& XC8;RE D'ETHYL& XC8;NE/& X3B1;-OL& XC9;FINE | Entry into regional phase | 24.06.2020 | Translation filed | 24.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Search fee paid | 24.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/40] | 08.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 20.02.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.05.2023 | CZ | 17.05.2023 | DK | 17.05.2023 | EE | 17.05.2023 | FI | 17.05.2023 | HR | 17.05.2023 | LT | 17.05.2023 | LV | 17.05.2023 | PL | 17.05.2023 | RO | 17.05.2023 | RS | 17.05.2023 | SE | 17.05.2023 | SI | 17.05.2023 | SK | 17.05.2023 | SM | 17.05.2023 | NO | 17.08.2023 | GR | 18.08.2023 | IS | 17.09.2023 | PT | 18.09.2023 | [2024/25] |
Former [2024/10] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
CZ | 17.05.2023 | ||
DK | 17.05.2023 | ||
EE | 17.05.2023 | ||
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RO | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
SK | 17.05.2023 | ||
SM | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/03] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
FI | 17.05.2023 | ||
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/01] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
LT | 17.05.2023 | ||
LV | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
HR | 17.05.2023 | ||
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
RS | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
PL | 17.05.2023 | ||
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
GR | 18.08.2023 | ||
IS | 17.09.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 17.05.2023 | |
SE | 17.05.2023 | ||
NO | 17.08.2023 | ||
PT | 18.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | PT | 18.09.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015045526 (KUM DON-HO [KR], et al) [I] 1-12 * examples 1-5; tables 2,3 * * figure 1 * * paragraph [0082] ** abstract *; | [A]EP3216795 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * tables 1,2 * * paragraphs [0018] , [0112] - [0124] * | International search | [A]KR20070112794 (DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC [US]) [A] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0129], [0147]; examples 5-12; claim !; and table 3. *; | [Y]KR101097378B (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0081], [0082], [0102]-[0104], [0117]: examples 4, 5; claims 1 , 5-7; and tables 1, 2. *; | [A]US2012196985 (LEE YONG-HO [US], et al) [A] 1-12* See the entire document. *; | [Y]KR20140019351 (HENKEL CORP [US]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraph [0003]; and claims 1-4, 8, 9. *; | [Y]KR20160054849 (LG CHEMICAL LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-12 * See paragraphs [0287], [0298], [0308]; examples 1-5; and claims 1, 5. * | by applicant | US4935474 | US5914289 | KR20030012308 | US6828394 | US6841631 | US6894128 |