EP3815351 - INFRARED IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OIL LEAK DETECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.05.2024 | New entry: Date of oral proceedings | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Quantum IR Technologies, LLC 10808 S. Riverfront Parkway, Suite 3077 South Jordan, UT 84095 / US | [2021/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISRAELSEN, Mark 10808 S. Riverfront Parkway Suite 3077 South Jordan, UT 84095 / US | [2021/18] | Representative(s) | ABM Agenzia Brevetti & Marchi Viale Giovanni Pisano, 31 56123 Pisa / IT | [2021/18] | Application number, filing date | 19796590.8 | 01.05.2019 | [2021/18] | WO2019US30226 | Priority number, date | US201862666610P | 03.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862666610 P | [2021/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019213279 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3815351 | Date: | 05.05.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N3/09, H04N5/33, H04N5/341, G01N25/18, G01N33/18, G01N33/26, G21C17/07, G01M3/02 | [2022/07] | CPC: |
G01J5/0066 (EP);
G01M3/38 (US);
G01J5/48 (EP);
G01J5/53 (US);
G01J5/54 (US);
G01M3/002 (EP);
G06T7/001 (US);
G06T7/11 (EP,US);
G06T7/174 (EP,US);
H04N23/23 (EP);
H04N5/33 (US);
G01J2005/0077 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/18] | H04N3/09, H04N5/33, H04N5/341, G01N25/18, G01N33/18, G01N33/26, G21C17/07 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/18] | Title | German: | INFRAROTABBILDUNGSSYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR ÖLLECKERKENNUNG | [2021/18] | English: | INFRARED IMAGING SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OIL LEAK DETECTION | [2021/18] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'IMAGERIE INFRAROUGE ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LA DÉTECTION DES FUITES DE PÉTROLE | [2021/18] | Entry into regional phase | 02.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/18] | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.10.2024 | Date of oral proceedings | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.06.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 01.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2022 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   22.06.2022 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | ID: | 01 | For: | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | Date: | 15.05.2023 | [2023/25] | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006091310 (FURRY DAVID W [US]) [X] 1,15 * abstract; figures 32,37 * * paragraphs [0119] - [0125] * [I] 2-14; | [XI]US8374438 (WAGNER MATTHIAS [US]) [X] 1,15 * abstract; figure 3 * * column 51, lines 21-62 * [I] 2-14; | [A]US2013147951 (BROWN ANDREW PHILLIP [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * abstract; figure 1; claims 1,18 ** paragraph [0025] *; | [XI]US2016238451 (ZENG YOUSHENG [US]) [X] 1,15 * abstract; figures 2,3 * * paragraph [0054] * [I] 2-14 | International search | [A]US6853452 (LAUFER GABRIEL [US]) [A] 1-59* ; entire document *; | [A]US2006091310 (FURRY DAVID W [US]) [A] 1-59 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2013147951 (BROWN ANDREW PHILLIP [US], et al) [A] 1-59 * ; entire document *; | [A]US2016238451 (ZENG YOUSHENG [US]) [A] 1-59 * ; entire document * | by applicant | US2006091310 |