EP3778774 - POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE FORMED THEREFROM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Lotte Chemical Corporation 300, Olympic-ro Songpa-gu Seoul, 05551 / KR | [2021/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JEONG, Hyuk Jin 56, Gosan-ro Uiwang-Si Gyeonggi-do 16073 / KR | 02 /
KOO, Ja Kwan 56, Gosan-ro Uiwang-Si Gyeonggi-do 16073 / KR | 03 /
LEE, Woo Jin 56, Gosan-ro Uiwang-Si Gyeonggi-do 16073 / KR | 04 /
KANG, Tae Gon 56, Gosan-ro Uiwang-Si Gyeonggi-do 16073 / KR | [2021/07] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [2024/36] |
Former [2021/07] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Speditionstraße 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 19796703.7 | 17.04.2019 | [2021/07] | WO2019KR04612 | Priority number, date | KR20180049555 | 30.04.2018 Original published format: KR 20180049555 | [2021/07] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019212171 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | KO | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3778774 | Date: | 17.02.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3778774 | Date: | 04.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L69/00, C08L83/04, C08L83/10, C08K5/521, C08K3/013, C08K5/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
C08L69/00 (EP,KR,US);
C08G77/16 (US);
C08G77/28 (US);
C08G77/448 (EP,US);
C08K3/013 (KR,US);
C08K3/22 (US);
C08K3/26 (US);
C08K3/30 (US);
C08K5/0066 (KR);
C08K5/521 (KR,US);
C08L83/04 (KR);
C08L83/10 (KR);
C08G77/04 (EP);
C08K2003/3009 (US);
C08K2003/387 (EP);
C08L2201/02 (EP,US);
C08L2201/08 (US);
C08L2203/30 (US);
C08L2205/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L69/00, C08K3/346, C08K3/38, C08K5/523, C08L83/04, C08L83/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | THERMOPLASTISCHE HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND DARAUS HERGESTELLTER FORMARTIKEL | [2021/07] | English: | POLYCARBONATE RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED ARTICLE FORMED THEREFROM | [2021/07] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE DE POLYCARBONATE ET ARTICLE MOULÉ FORMÉ À PARTIR DE CELLE-CI | [2021/07] | Entry into regional phase | 02.11.2020 | Translation filed | 02.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 02.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/07] | 08.06.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2013313493 (WEN LIANG [CN], et al); | [Y]WO2017042271 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20000060307 (LG CABLE LTD [KR]); | [A]KR20140075517 (CHEIL IND INC [KR]); | [Y]KR20150013758 ; | [Y]KR20160079786 (SABIC GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES BV [NL]); | [Y]US2017037245 (VAN DE WETERING KARIN IRENE [NL]); | [Y]WO2017042271 (DOW CORNING [US], et al) | by applicant | KR20120078559 |