EP3787482 - WEARABLE DEVICE TO MONITOR MUSCULOSKELETAL LOADING, ESTIMATE TISSUE MICRODAMAGE AND PROVIDE INJURY RISK BIOFEEDBACK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 08.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.06.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vanderbilt University 305 Kirkland Hall 2201 West End Avenue Nashville, TN 37240 / US | [2021/10] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATIJEVICH, Emily 2201 West End Avenue 305 Kirkland Hall Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 02 /
SCOTT, Leon 2201 West End Avenue 305 Kirkland Hall Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | 03 /
ZELIK, Karl 2201 West End Avenue 305 Kirkland Hall Nashville, Tennessee 37240 / US | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/10] | Heubeck, Christian Weickmann & Weickmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19797004.9 | 30.04.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019US29790 | Priority number, date | US201862664479P | 30.04.2018 Original published format: US 201862664479 P | [2021/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019213012 | Date: | 07.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/45] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3787482 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/10] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 07.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.11.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/00, A61B5/11, A61B5/22 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
A61B5/45 (EP);
A61B5/11 (US);
A61B5/1038 (EP);
A61B5/296 (EP,US);
A61B5/4509 (US);
A61B5/4538 (EP,US);
A61B5/4806 (US);
A61B5/6801 (US);
A61B5/6807 (EP);
A61B5/6898 (US);
A61B5/7405 (US);
A61B5/7435 (US);
A61B5/7455 (US);
A61B5/746 (US);
A61B2562/0219 (EP,US);
A61B2562/0247 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/10] | A61B5/00, A61B5/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Title | German: | TRAGBARE VORRICHTUNG ZUR ÜBERWACHUNG DER MUSKELSKELETTBELASTUNG, ZUR SCHÄTZUNG VON GEWEBEMIKROSCHÄDEN UND ZUR BEREITSTELLUNG VON BIOFEEDBACK ZUM VERLETZUNGSRISIKO | [2021/10] | English: | WEARABLE DEVICE TO MONITOR MUSCULOSKELETAL LOADING, ESTIMATE TISSUE MICRODAMAGE AND PROVIDE INJURY RISK BIOFEEDBACK | [2021/10] | French: | DISPOSITIF VESTIMENTAIRE POUR SURVEILLER LE CHARGEMENT MUSCULO-SQUELETTIQUE, ESTIMER DES MICRO-DOMMAGES TISSULAIRES ET FOURNIR UNE RÉTROACTION BIOLOGIQUE DE RISQUE DE BLESSURE | [2021/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 20.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2024 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014135593 (JAYALTH DHANANJA [US], et al); | [X]WO2016130867 (HRL LAB LLC [US], et al); | [X]WO2017062544 (UNIV OF PITTSBURGH-OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION [US]) | International search | [A]WO2012025622 (SMARTEX S R L [IT], et al); | [A]US2014276242 (CHEN SHYH-MIN [US], et al); | [X]US2017035354 (JAYALATH DHANANJA [US], et al); | [X]WO2017062544 (UNIV OF PITTSBURGH-OF THE COMMONWEALTH SYSTEM OF HIGHER EDUCATION [US]); | [A]US2017312612 (BLEICH JEFFERY L [US], et al) |