EP3789333 - ELECTROMECHANICAL BI-DIRECTIONAL EMERGENCY STOP DEVICE FOR A LIFT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/10] | ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTIVATION OF A BI-DIRECTIONAL EMERGENCY STOP DEVICE FOR A LIFT | ||
[2022/22] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.01.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.12.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 13.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 11.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GB, IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DYNATECH, DYNAMICS & TECHNOLOGY, S.L. Pol. Ind. de Pina de Ebro, sector C, p-9 50750 Pina de Ebro (Zaragoza) / ES | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/10] | For all designated states DYNATECH, DYNAMICS & TECHNOLOGY, S.L. Pol. Ind. de Pina de Ebro, sector C, p-9 50750 Pina de Ebro (Zaragoza) / ES | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATEO MUR, Francisco de Asis Pol. Ind. de Pina de Ebro, sector C, p-9 50750 PINA DE EBRO / ES | [2021/10] | Representative(s) | Hernández Hernández, Carlos InterAlia Patentes & Marcas Calle Fernando de la Peña 29, 3° Dcha 37005 Salamanca / ES | [2023/23] |
Former [2021/10] | Capitán García, Maria Nuria Felipe IV no. 10, bajo iz. 28014 Madrid / ES | Application number, filing date | 19797315.9 | 29.08.2019 | [2021/10] | WO2019ES70576 | Filing language | ES | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021001580 | Date: | 07.01.2021 | Language: | ES | [2021/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3789333 | Date: | 10.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3789333 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B66B5/18, B66B5/22, B66B5/16 | [2021/10] | CPC: |
B66B5/18 (EP,KR,US);
B66B1/3469 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/10] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE BIDIREKTIONALE NOTSTOPPVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN AUFZUG | [2022/22] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL BI-DIRECTIONAL EMERGENCY STOP DEVICE FOR A LIFT | [2022/22] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE BIDIRECTIONNEL POUR UN ASCENSEUR | [2022/22] |
Former [2021/10] | ELEKTROMECHANISCHE AKTIVIERUNG EINER BIDIREKTIONALEN NOTSTOPPVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINEN AUFZUG | ||
Former [2021/10] | ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTIVATION OF A BI-DIRECTIONAL EMERGENCY STOP DEVICE FOR A LIFT | ||
Former [2021/10] | ACTIONNEMENT ÉLECTROMÉCANIQUE D'UN DISPOSITIF BIDIRECTIONNEL D'ARRÊT D'URGENCE D'UN ASCENSEUR | Entry into regional phase | 17.11.2020 | Translation filed | 17.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 17.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/10] | 17.11.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.09.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.12.2022 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 17.01.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.03.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 25.04.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | IE | 29.08.2023 | CH | 31.08.2023 | GB | 07.09.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/25] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
CH | 31.08.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/16] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | HR | 07.06.2023 | |
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | NO | 07.09.2023 | |
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | NO | 07.09.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP1431230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2013110829 (DYNATECH DYNAMICS & TECHNOLOGY S L [ES], et al) [A] 1-8* abstract figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102012111071 (LIENEMANN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE102013111385 (LIENEMANN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract paragraphs [0069], [0070] figures 10-12 * | [A]EP1431230 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 1-3 *; | [A]WO2013110829 (DYNATECH DYNAMICS & TECHNOLOGY S L [ES], et al) [A] 1-8 * abstract ** figures 1,2 *; | [A]DE102012111071 (LIENEMANN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * figures 4-6 *; | [A]DE102013111385 (LIENEMANN MANFRED [DE]) [A] 1-8 * abstract * * paragraphs [0069] , [0 70] * * figures 10-12 * | by applicant | EP1749784 | WO2014075954 | CH707833 |