EP3873483 - HAIR CARE ACTIVE AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.08.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 06.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Givaudan SA Chemin de la Parfumerie 5 1214 Vernier / CH | [2021/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCANDOLERA, Amandine 28 rue Gilbert 51100 Reims / FR | 02 /
AURIOL, Daniel 39 avenue du Chateau de Meynial 31120 Roques sur Garonne / FR | 03 /
REYNAUD, Romain 8 rue Mondran 31400 Toulouse / FR | [2021/36] | Representative(s) | Global Patents Givaudan SA Grafenaustrasse 7 6300 Zug / CH | [2021/36] | Application number, filing date | 19797636.8 | 29.10.2019 | [2021/36] | WO2019EP79509 | Priority number, date | GB20180017625 | 29.10.2018 Original published format: GB 201817625 | [2021/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020089216 | Date: | 07.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/19] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3873483 | Date: | 08.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 07.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/7048, A61K31/198, A61K8/00 | [2021/36] | CPC: |
A61Q7/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K8/602 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/198 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K8/44 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/0014 (KR);
A61P17/14 (KR);
A61Q19/04 (EP,IL);
A61Q5/00 (EP,IL,KR);
A61Q5/10 (EP,IL,US);
A61K2300/00 (IL);
A61K2800/522 (US);
A61K2800/591 (US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K31/198, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K31/7048, A61K2300/00 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/36] | Title | German: | HAARPFLEGEWIRKSTOFF | [2021/36] | English: | HAIR CARE ACTIVE AGENT | [2021/36] | French: | AGENT ACTIF DE SOINS CAPILLAIRES | [2021/36] | Entry into regional phase | 26.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 26.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/36] | 26.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 25.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.01.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | 25.03.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 25.03.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [IDY]US2012114583 (GIESEN MELANIE [DE], et al); | [IY]FR3032351 (GELYMA [FR]); | [Y]US2017181948 (WU JEFFREY M [US]); | by applicant | US4387090 | US2001043912 | WO2007144368 | US2011038968 | US2012114583 | WO2015035164 |