EP3863737 - WEIGHTLIFTING MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coulter Ventures, LLC 545 E. 5th Avenue Columbus, OH 43201 / US | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HENNIGER, William c/o Coulter Ventures, LLC 545 E. 5th Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43201 / US | 02 /
DUNAHAY, Nash c/o Coulter Ventures, LLC 545 E. 5th Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43201 / US | 03 /
COUGHLAN, Laurie Ann c/o Coulter Ventures, LLC 545 E. 5th Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43201 / US | 04 /
MCCLURE, Tyler c/o Coulter Ventures, LLC 545 E. 5th Avenue Columbus, Ohio 43201 / US | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP One Portwall Square Portwall Lane Bristol BS1 6BH / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2021/33] | Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 19797912.3 | 14.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019US56130 | Priority number, date | US201862745127P | 12.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745127 P | US201862745838P | 15.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862745838 P | US201862746909P | 17.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862746909 P | US201862747953P | 19.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862747953 P | US201862749972P | 24.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862749972 P | US201862750690P | 25.10.2018 Original published format: US 201862750690 P | US201962790324P | 09.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962790324 P | US201962797048P | 25.01.2019 Original published format: US 201962797048 P | US201962890419P | 22.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962890419 P | [2021/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020077340 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863737 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A63B21/062, A63B21/00, A63B21/16, A63B21/04, A63B21/055, A63B71/00 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A63B21/0628 (EP,US);
A63B21/156 (US);
A63B21/00065 (EP,US);
A63B21/0428 (US);
A63B21/0442 (EP,US);
A63B21/0552 (EP,US);
A63B21/062 (EP);
A63B21/08 (US);
A63B21/154 (EP,US);
A63B21/16 (EP);
A63B21/4043 (EP);
A63B2071/009 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Title | German: | GEWICHTHEBEMASCHINE | [2021/33] | English: | WEIGHTLIFTING MACHINE | [2021/33] | French: | MACHINE D'HALTÉROPHILIE | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 12.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2007093365 (BATCA ROGER [US]); | [A]US7998040 (KRAM RODGER [US], et al); | [XI]US2017246504 (SIMMONS LOUIE [US]); | [A]WO2018093699 (SPECIALTY FITNESS SYSTEMS LLC [US]) |