EP3877142 - SWITCHING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SWITCHING A FLAT FILM MACHINE FROM AN INPUT PRODUCT TO A SUBSEQUENT PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.02.2024 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstrasse 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHMITZ, Torsten c/o Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 02 /
COLELL, Waldemar c/o Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | 03 /
GROEPPER, Bernd-Alexander c/o Windmöller & Hölscher KG Münsterstr. 50 49525 Lengerich / DE | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Bals & Vogel Patentanwälte PartGmbB Konrad-Zuse-Str. 4 44801 Bochum / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/37] | Patentanwälte Bals & Vogel Universitätsstrasse 142 44799 Bochum / DE | Application number, filing date | 19798303.4 | 05.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019EP80261 | Priority number, date | DE201810127679 | 06.11.2018 Original published format: DE102018127679 | [2021/37] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094652 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | DE | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3877142 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B29C48/08, B29C48/25, B29C48/92, B29C48/31, B29C48/10 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
B29C48/305 (EP,US);
B29C48/92 (EP,US);
B29C48/08 (EP,US);
B29C48/914 (EP);
B29D7/01 (EP);
B29C2948/92066 (US);
B29C2948/92133 (US);
B29C2948/92152 (US);
B29C2948/92209 (US);
B29C2948/92904 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Title | German: | UMSTELLVORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN FÜR DIE UMSTELLUNG EINER FLACHFOLIENMASCHINE VON EINEM EINSATZPRODUKT AUF EIN FOLGEPRODUKT | [2021/37] | English: | SWITCHING DEVICE AND METHOD FOR SWITCHING A FLAT FILM MACHINE FROM AN INPUT PRODUCT TO A SUBSEQUENT PRODUCT | [2021/37] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'INVERSION ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FAIRE PASSER UNE MACHINE DE PRODUCTION DE FEUILLES PLATES D'UN PRODUIT DE BASE À UN PRODUIT SECONDAIRE | [2021/37] | Entry into regional phase | 07.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 07.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 05.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.07.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.11.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US5424018 (PAUL WILLIAM C [US], et al) [Y] 3-5,15 * abstract * * claims 1-9 * * figures 1-6 *; | [X]JPH1177805 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-4,7-14 * paragraph [0020] * * claims 1-5 * * figures 1-7 *; | [X]US2003050717 (HIRATA HAJIME [JP], et al) [X] 1-4,6-14,16,17 * paragraph [0243] * * claims 1-33 * * figures 1-32 *; | [Y]EP2657000 (MAKU AG [CH]) [Y] 3-5,15 * abstract * * claims 1-14 ** figures 1-2d *; | [XY]DE102016112121 (BRÜCKNER MASCHB GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [X] 1,2,6-13,16,17 * abstract * * paragraph [0219] - paragraph [0225] * * claims 1-20 * * figures 1-11 * [Y] 3-5,15 |