EP3876713 - PATIENT-DERIVED AMYLOID XENOGRAFT RODENT MODEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2021/37] | PATIENT-DERIVED AMYLOID XENOGRAFT NON-HUMAN ANIMAL MODEL | ||
[2024/17] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.04.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.08.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.05.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 02.10.2024 [2024/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Neurimmune AG Wagistrasse 18 8952 Schlieren / CH | [2021/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MICHALON, Aubin Martinsbergstrasse 36 5400 Baden / CH | 02 /
GRIMM, Jan Bürglistrasse 16 8600 Dübendorf / CH | [2021/37] | Representative(s) | Jaekel, Robert Sebastian Witthoff Jaekel Steinecke, Patentanwälte PartG mbB Patent Department P.O. Box 11 40 52412 Jülich / DE | [2021/37] | Application number, filing date | 19798323.2 | 11.11.2019 | [2021/37] | WO2019EP80829 | Priority number, date | EP20180205502 | 09.11.2018 Original published format: EP 18205502 | [2021/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020094883 | Date: | 14.05.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/20] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3876713 | Date: | 15.09.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.05.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3876713 | Date: | 02.10.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A01K67/027, C07K14/47 | [2021/37] | CPC: |
A01K67/027 (EP,US);
C07K14/4711 (EP);
A01K2207/10 (EP,US);
A01K2227/105 (EP,US);
A01K2267/0318 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VOM PATIENTEN GEWONNENES AMYLOID-XENOTRANSPLANTAT-NAGETIERMODELL | [2024/17] | English: | PATIENT-DERIVED AMYLOID XENOGRAFT RODENT MODEL | [2024/17] | French: | MODÈLE DE RONGEUR DE XÉNOGREFFE AMYLOÏDE DÉRIVÉE D'UN PATIENT | [2024/17] |
Former [2021/37] | VOM PATIENTEN GEWONNENES AMYLOID-XENOTRANSPLANTAT-MODELL EINES NICHTMENSCHLICHEN TIERES | ||
Former [2021/37] | PATIENT-DERIVED AMYLOID XENOGRAFT NON-HUMAN ANIMAL MODEL | ||
Former [2021/37] | MODÈLE ANIMAL NON HUMAIN DE XÉNOGREFFE AMYLOÏDE DÉRIVÉ D'UN PATIENT | Entry into regional phase | 09.06.2021 | National basic fee paid | 09.06.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.06.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.06.2021 | Examination requested [2021/37] | 09.06.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.01.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 04.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 27.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Request for further processing for: | 04.04.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 04.04.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.04.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.11.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2016120811 (PROTHENA BIOSCIENCES LTD [IE], et al); | by applicant | WO2014124334 | WO2015092077 | WO2016120810 | US2017058023 | WO2018007923 | US9879080 |