EP3840813 - IMPROVED TUBING FOR MANUFACTURING EXPANDABLE DEVICES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.04.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 28.02.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Memory Metal Holland B.V. Gronausestraat 1220 7534 AT Enschede / NL | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/26] | For all designated states Besselink, Petrus, A. Gronausetraat 1220 7534 AT Enschede / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BESSELINK, Petrus A. Gronausestraat 1220 7534 AT Enschede / NL | [2024/29] |
Former [2021/26] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Arnold & Siedsma Bezuidenhoutseweg 57 2594 AC The Hague / NL | [2021/26] | Application number, filing date | 19798706.8 | 19.08.2019 | [2021/26] | WO2019IB00924 | Priority number, date | US201862719736P | 20.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862719736 P | [2021/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2020039253 | Date: | 27.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/09] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3840813 | Date: | 30.06.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.02.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3840813 | Date: | 14.08.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.05.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61M25/00, A61B17/00, A61F2/00, A61M39/00, A61B17/08, A61B17/122, A61B17/04, A61B17/11, A61F2/04 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
A61M25/00 (EP);
A61M25/0013 (US);
A61B17/0401 (EP);
A61B17/0487 (EP);
A61F2/04 (EP);
A61B17/083 (EP);
A61B17/122 (EP);
A61B2017/00867 (EP);
A61B2017/0419 (EP);
A61B2017/0427 (EP);
A61B2017/0464 (EP);
A61B2017/1139 (EP);
A61M2205/0266 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/26] | A61M25/00, A61B17/00, A61F2/00, A61M39/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERBESSERTER SCHLAUCH ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON EXPANDIERBAREN VORRICHTUNGEN | [2021/26] | English: | IMPROVED TUBING FOR MANUFACTURING EXPANDABLE DEVICES | [2021/26] | French: | TUBAGE AMÉLIORÉ POUR LA FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIFS EXTENSIBLES | [2021/26] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/26] | 18.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.04.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2015342877 (MENACHEM AVSHALOM BEN [IL], et al); | [A]EP3031409 (COOK MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]) | by applicant | US5885258 | US2002052627 | US6428634 | US6780175 | US7037321 | US8052670 | US8377037 | US2014255246 |