EP3863709 - ELECTRO-STIMULATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 05.05.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 16.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 18.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CH | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wecare Thecnologies S.r.l. Via G. Washington 15 20146 Milan / IT | [2021/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GENITONI, Valerio c/o WeCare Thecnologies S.r.l. Via G. Washington, 15 20146 Milan / IT | [2021/33] | Representative(s) | Di Bernardo, Antonio, et al Thinx S.r.l. P.le Luigi Cadorna, 10 20123 Milano / IT | [2021/33] | Application number, filing date | 19798720.9 | 08.10.2019 | [2021/33] | WO2019IB58560 | Priority number, date | IT20180009240 | 08.10.2018 Original published format: IT201800009240 | [2021/33] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020075070 | Date: | 16.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/16] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3863709 | Date: | 18.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3863709 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/04, A61N1/36 | [2021/33] | CPC: |
A61N1/36021 (EP);
A61N1/36034 (EP);
A61N1/0456 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ELEKTROSTIMULATIONSGERÄT | [2021/33] | English: | ELECTRO-STIMULATION APPARATUS | [2021/33] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉLECTROSTIMULATION | [2021/33] | Entry into regional phase | 03.05.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.05.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.05.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.05.2021 | Examination requested [2021/33] | 03.05.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 08.03.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 07.06.2023 | ES | 07.06.2023 | HR | 07.06.2023 | MC | 07.06.2023 | PL | 07.06.2023 | RO | 07.06.2023 | RS | 07.06.2023 | SK | 07.06.2023 | SM | 07.06.2023 | NO | 07.09.2023 | GR | 08.09.2023 | IS | 07.10.2023 | GB | 08.10.2023 | CH | 31.10.2023 | [2024/34] |
Former [2024/33] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
GB | 08.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
MC | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
PL | 07.06.2023 | ||
RO | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | CZ | 07.06.2023 | |
ES | 07.06.2023 | ||
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
IS | 07.10.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
SK | 07.06.2023 | ||
SM | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
HR | 07.06.2023 | ||
RS | 07.06.2023 | ||
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
GR | 08.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | ES | 07.06.2023 | |
NO | 07.09.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | ES | 07.06.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2014031895 (RAHIMI SHAUN RAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5 * paragraph [0039] - paragraph [0043] * [A] 3,6-8 [I] 9; | [XA]US2014296935 (FERREE THOMAS [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0097] - paragraph [0103]; figure 1C *[A] 2-9 |