EP3792435 - VEHICULAR DOOR CONTROL DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alpha Corporation 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NISHIZUKA, Mitsuo c/o Alpha Corporation 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | [2022/33] |
Former [2021/11] | 01 /
NISHIZUKA Mitsuo c/o ALPHA CORPORATION, 6-8, Fukuura 1-chome, Kanazawa-ku Yokohama-shi, Kanagawa 236-0004 / JP | Representative(s) | Daub, Thomas Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Daub Bahnhofstrasse 5 88662 Überlingen / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19799146.6 | 10.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019JP18786 | Priority number, date | JP20180092002 | 11.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018092002 | [2021/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216421 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792435 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2021 | Classification | IPC: | E05B85/12, E05B81/76, E05F15/73, B60Q3/217 | [2022/03] | CPC: |
B60Q3/217 (EP,US);
E05B81/77 (EP,US);
B60J5/0413 (US);
B60J5/0468 (US);
B60R25/01 (US);
B60R25/20 (US);
E05B81/56 (US);
E05B81/76 (EP);
E05B85/12 (EP,US);
H03K17/9622 (EP);
B60Q2900/40 (EP);
B60R16/0231 (EP);
E05Y2400/86 (US);
E05Y2900/531 (US);
G06F3/0488 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | E05B85/12, B60J5/00, E05B81/76, E05F15/73, G06F3/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGTÜRSTEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2021/11] | English: | VEHICULAR DOOR CONTROL DEVICE | [2021/11] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE DE PORTIÈRE DE VÉHICULE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2020 | Translation filed | 08.10.2020 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 08.07.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2011181387 (POPELARD ALEXANDRE [JP]) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0033] , [ 0037] , [ 0041] , [ 0042] , [ 0049] - [0055]; figures 1-7 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 4; | [XI]DE102015014615 (DAIMLER AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * paragraphs [0007] , [ 0008] , [ 0029] - [0038]; figures 1-3C * [I] 5,6; | [Y]US2018038146 (LINDEN H PAUL TSVI [US], et al) [Y] 5,6* paragraphs [0032] - [0042]; figures 1-13D *; | [Y]JP2018053667 (TS TECH CO LTD) [Y] 5,6 * figures 1-6 * | International search | [Y]JP2003206675 (MAZDA MOTOR) [Y] 5, 6* , *; | [XY]US2015077227 (SALTER STUART C [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * , [0016]-[0035] Fig. 1 - 7 & DE 102013217670 A1 & CN 103670068 A * [Y] 4-6; | [Y]JP2017172140 (MITSUBA CORP) [Y] 4-6 * , * | by applicant | JPS646480 | JP2018092002 |