EP3792236 - METHOD FOR PREPARING 1,2-DIFLUOROETHYLENE AND/OR 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.12.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-Shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOMATSU, Yuzo c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD., Umeda Center Building, 4-12, Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19799257.1 | 25.04.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019JP17669 | Priority number, date | JP20180089063 | 07.05.2018 Original published format: JP 2018089063 | [2021/11] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019216239 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | JA | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3792236 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C19/08, C07C21/18, C07B61/00, C07C17/21 | [2022/09] | CPC: |
C07C17/206 (EP);
C07C17/20 (US);
B01J23/26 (US);
C07C17/21 (EP);
C07C17/25 (EP,US);
C07B61/00 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C07C17/206, C07C19/08 (EP);
C07C17/206, C07C19/12 (EP);
C07C17/21, C07C19/12 (EP);
C07C17/25, C07C21/18 (EP) |
Former IPC [2021/11] | C07C17/20, C07C17/25, C07C19/08, C07C21/18, C07B61/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON 1,2-DIFLUORETHYLEN UND / ODER 1,1,2-TRIFLUORETHAN | [2021/11] | English: | METHOD FOR PREPARING 1,2-DIFLUOROETHYLENE AND/OR 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROETHANE | [2021/11] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE 1,2-DIFLUOROÉTHYLÈNE ET/OU DE 1,1,2-TRIFLUOROÉTHANE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.11.2020 | Translation filed | 04.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 25.04.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]JPH03504684 [A] 1-10* , & US 4816609 A & US 5246903 A & US 4816609 A & WO 1990/011131 A1 & EP 389650 A1 *; | [Y]WO2017104828 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 6, 10 * , $kMr0040&CN108368011 A *; | [XY] - MCBEE, E. T. et al., "Fluorinated Derivatives of Ethane", INDUSTRIAL AND ENGINEERING CHEMISTRY, (19470000), vol. 39, no. 3, pages 409 - 412, XP055651252 [X] 1-3 [Y] 4-10 | [Y] - Nobuo Ishikawa; Yoshiro Kobayashi, "Passage; Fluorine compounds : its chemistry and applications", Nobuo Ishikawa; Yoshiro Kobayashi, Nobuo Ishikawa; Yoshiro Kobayashi, Fluorine compounds : its chemistry and applications, JP, Kodansha Co., Ltd., (19790201), pages 80 - 85, ISBN 978-4-06-139271-7, XP009524087 [Y] 4-10 [Y] 6, 10 [Y] 6, 10 | [A] - DOLBIER, WILLIAM R. JR. et al., "Anomalous elimination of HCl from 2-chloro-1,1-difluoroethane. Likely involvement of a 1,2-FCl interchange mechanism", Tetrahedron Letters, (20020000), vol. 43, no. 45, pages 8075 - 8077, XP004387192 [A] 1-10 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0040-4039(02)01952-4 | by applicant | JPS6230730 | US5155082 | JP2013237624 | JP2013241348 | WO2015125874 | JP2016056132 |