EP3811393 - BREAKER AUTO-SYNCHRONIZER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.10.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ABB Schweiz AG Brown Boveri Strasse 6 5400 Baden / CH | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LOPEZ, Camilo 1045 Lexington Drive Export, Pennsylvania 15632 / US | 02 /
FOLTZ, Mark 64 School Street Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15220 / US | 03 /
MILLER, Steve Lee 140 Cypress Hill Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15235 / US | 04 /
DOWDELL, Kevin 406 Shelburne Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | 05 /
WIELAND, Mark Stephen 8043 Maureen Drive Cranberry, Pennsylvania 16066 / US | 06 /
MAJORS, Alan 4715 Havana Drive Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania 15239 / US | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Maiwald GmbH Engineering Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/17] | Gunzelmann, Rainer Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 19799842.0 | 09.05.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019US31437 | Priority number, date | US201862669042P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669042 P | US201862669048P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669048 P | US201862669057P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669057 P | US201862669063P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669063 P | US201862669070P | 09.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862669070 P | [2021/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019217625 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3811393 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F01D17/14, F01D17/26, F01D17/02, F02C7/232, F02C9/26, F02C9/52, F02C9/54, F01D17/06, F16K31/122, F16K37/00, G01D3/08, G01D5/22, H02J3/40, F01D21/02, F02C9/28 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
F01D17/145 (EP,US);
F01C20/28 (US);
F01D17/06 (EP,US);
F01D17/26 (EP,US);
F01D21/02 (EP,US);
F01K13/003 (US);
F01K13/02 (US);
F02C7/232 (EP,US);
F02C9/263 (EP,US);
F02C9/28 (EP,US);
F02C9/52 (EP,US);
F02C9/54 (EP,US);
F16K31/122 (EP);
F16K37/0041 (EP,US);
F16K37/0083 (US);
G01D3/08 (EP);
G01D5/2291 (EP);
G01P21/02 (US);
G01R31/2829 (US);
H02J3/381 (US);
H02J3/40 (EP,US);
F05D2220/31 (EP,US);
F05D2260/80 (EP,US);
F05D2260/84 (EP);
F05D2270/02 (EP,US);
F05D2270/021 (US);
F05D2270/16 (EP);
F05D2270/64 (EP);
F05D2270/80 (US);
F05D2270/804 (EP);
F15B2211/327 (EP);
F15B2211/6336 (EP);
F15B2211/634 (EP);
F15B2211/6656 (EP);
F15B2211/7053 (EP);
F15B2211/7656 (EP);
F15B2211/8757 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/09] | H02J3/40 | ||
Former IPC [2021/17] | H01H71/12, H01H71/74, H02H3/08, H02H3/20, H02H3/36, H02H3/46, G01R31/327, G01R31/28 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | SELBSTSYNCHRONISIERER FÜR UNTERBRECHER | [2021/17] | English: | BREAKER AUTO-SYNCHRONIZER | [2021/17] | French: | AUTO-SYNCHRONISEUR DE DISJONCTEUR | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 09.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 29.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.10.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/29] | 13.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2024/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US4788647 (MCMANUS KIRBY L [US], et al); | [XI]EP2273649 (ALSTOM TECHNOLOGY LTD [CH]); | [A]US8174268 (BOSE SANJAY [US], et al) | International search | [A]US6292717 (ALEXANDER JAMES O [US], et al); | [A]US8174268 (BOSE SANJAY [US], et al); | [A]US9438026 (FRANKS JEFFREY L [US], et al) | by applicant | US4788647 | EP2273649 |