EP3813452 - RANDOM ACCESS METHOD, TERMINAL AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.04.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283 BBK Road Wusha Chang'An Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHEN, Li c/o Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. 283, BBK Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2021/17] | Representative(s) | Conti, Marco Bugnion S.p.A. Via di Corticella, 87 40128 Bologna / IT | [2021/17] | Application number, filing date | 19800708.0 | 30.04.2019 | [2021/17] | WO2019CN85106 | Priority number, date | CN201810444829 | 10.05.2018 Original published format: CN201810444829 | [2021/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019214500 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | ZH | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3813452 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.06.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/04, // H04W74/00, H04L12/24, H04W74/08 | [2021/28] | CPC: |
H04W74/006 (EP);
H04W72/23 (CN,US);
H04W74/0833 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0896 (US);
H04W74/002 (EP,CN,US);
H04L41/0803 (EP);
H04W48/12 (EP);
H04W72/0453 (EP);
H04W84/042 (US);
Y02D30/70 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/17] | H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/17] | Title | German: | DIREKTZUGRIFFSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2021/17] | English: | RANDOM ACCESS METHOD, TERMINAL AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2021/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACCÈS ALÉATOIRE, TERMINAL, ET DISPOSITIF RÉSEAU | [2021/17] | Entry into regional phase | 10.12.2020 | Translation filed | 10.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 10.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/17] | 30.12.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN102202324 (CHINA ACADEMY OF TELECOMM TECH); | [XY]WO2018063944 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); |