Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP3790488

Designated contracting statesAL 
AT 
BE 
BG 
CH 
CY 
CZ 
DE 
DK 
EE 
ES 
FI 
FR 
GB 
GR 
HR 
HU 
IE 
IS 
IT 
LI 
LT 
LU 
LV 
MC 
MK 
MT 
NL 
NO 
PL 
PT 
RO 
RS 
SE 
SI 
SK 
SM 
TR 
Examination procedure03.04.2025Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Entry into regional phase27.11.2020National basic fee paid 
27.11.2020Search fee paid 
27.11.2020Designation fee(s) paid 
27.11.2020Examination fee paid 
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.03.2021Renewal fee patent year 03
07.03.2022Renewal fee patent year 04
09.03.2023Renewal fee patent year 05
21.05.2024Renewal fee patent year 06
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:17.03.2021 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR
 
Event date:17.03.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:20201127
 
Event date:17.03.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT
Validation States:BA ME
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:URBANSKI, JOHN PAUL
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:MILLER, BROCK
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:GRAVETT, MATTHEW
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:ABOU-MARIE, RUND
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:LUK, MARIA
 
Event date:28.04.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED)
INVENTOR:KAMAL, AHMAD
 
Event date:12.02.2021 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:12.02.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE
 
Event date:16.11.2019 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:11.08.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:11.08.2021 
Event description:REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED)
 
Event date:18.01.2021 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE
 
Event date:26.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/14 20060101AFI20211222BHEP
 
Event date:26.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 17/34 20060101ALI20211222BHEP
 
Event date:26.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 90/00 20160101ALI20211222BHEP
 
Event date:26.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20211222BHEP
 
Event date:26.01.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/00 20060101ALI20211222BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/14 20060101AFI20220330BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 17/34 20060101ALI20220330BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 90/00 20160101ALI20220330BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20220330BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/00 20060101ALI20220330BHEP
 
Event date:04.05.2022 
Event description:SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:20220405
 
Event date:20.07.2022 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:BAYLIS MEDICAL COMPANY INC.
 
Event date:05.10.2022 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:BOSTON SCIENTIFIC MEDICAL DEVICE LIMITED
 
Event date:03.12.2024 
Event description:DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1
 
Event date:03.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/14 20060101AFI20241030BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 17/34 20060101ALI20241030BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 90/00 20160101ALI20241030BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 5/00 20060101ALI20241030BHEP
 
Event date:04.12.2024 
Event description:INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT
IPC CLASSIFICATION:A61B 18/00 20060101ALI20241030BHEP
 
Event date:08.01.2025 
Event description:INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED
Effective DATE:20241204
 
Event date:04.04.2025 
Event description:GRANT FEE PAID
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3