EP3790488 - APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PUNCTURING TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Boston Scientific Medical Device Limited Ballybrit Business Park Galway H91 Y868 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/40] | For all designated states Boston Scientific Medical Device Limited Ballybrit Business Park Galway, H91 Y868 IE / IE | ||
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Baylis Medical Company Inc. 5825 Explorer Drive Mississauga, Ontario L4W 5P6 / CA | ||
Former [2021/11] | For all designated states Baylis Medical Company Inc. 5959 Trans-Canada Highway Montreal, Québec H4T 1A1 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
URBANSKI, John Paul c/o Baylis Medical Company Inc 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | 02 /
MILLER, Brock c/o Baylis Medical Company Inc 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | 03 /
GRAVETT, Matthew 6020 Derry Road, Unit 71 Milton, Ontario L9T 8L6 / CA | 04 /
ABOU-MARIE, Rund 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | 05 /
LUK, Maria c/o Baylis Medical Company Inc 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | 06 /
KAMAL, Ahmad 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | [2021/17] |
Former [2021/11] | 01 /
URBANSKI, John Paul 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | ||
02 /
MILLER, Brock 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | |||
03 /
GRAVETT, Matthew 6020 Derry Road, Unit 71 Milton, Ontario L9T 8L6 / CA | |||
04 /
ABOU-MARIE, Rund 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | |||
05 /
LUK, Maria 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | |||
06 /
KAMAL, Ahmad 2645 Matheson Blvd. East Missisauga, Ontario L4W 5S4 / CA | Representative(s) | Pfenning, Meinig & Partner mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Joachimsthaler Straße 10-12 10719 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/11] | KIPA AB P O Box 1065 251 10 Helsingborg / SE | Application number, filing date | 19800741.1 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IB53751 | Priority number, date | US201862668396P | 08.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862668396 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215621 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3790488 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B18/14, A61B17/34, A61B90/00, A61B5/00, A61B18/00 | [2022/04] | CPC: |
A61B90/39 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61B18/1492 (KR);
A61B17/3415 (CN);
A61B18/1487 (CN,US);
A61B17/3417 (CN);
A61B17/3421 (CN);
A61B17/3476 (KR);
A61B18/1482 (EP,US);
A61B34/20 (KR);
A61B5/283 (KR);
A61B5/287 (EP);
A61B5/366 (EP);
A61B5/4836 (EP);
A61B5/6851 (EP);
A61B5/6869 (EP);
A61B90/06 (US);
A61M25/0105 (CN);
A61M25/0108 (CN);
A61M25/09 (CN);
A61M25/09041 (CN);
A61B2017/00247 (EP);
A61B2017/3454 (CN);
A61B2018/00077 (US);
A61B2018/00148 (US);
A61B2018/00351 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2018/00357 (CN,KR);
A61B2018/00577 (EP,KR,US);
A61B2018/00601 (EP);
A61B2018/00702 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP,US);
A61B2018/1435 (US);
A61B2018/144 (KR,US);
A61B2034/2055 (KR);
A61B2090/065 (EP,US);
A61B2090/0811 (EP);
A61B2090/376 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3925 (EP,US);
A61B2090/3937 (EP);
A61B2090/3941 (CN,KR,US);
A61B2090/3966 (EP,CN,US);
A61B2090/3995 (EP,US);
A61B2218/002 (US);
A61B2218/007 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | A61B18/14, A61B17/34, A61B90/00, A61B5/042, A61B5/00, A61B18/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR PUNKTIERUNG VON GEWEBE | [2021/11] | English: | APPARATUS AND METHODS FOR PUNCTURING TISSUE | [2021/11] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉS POUR PERFORER UN TISSU | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 27.11.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Search fee paid | 27.11.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.11.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.11.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 21.10.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014228841 (DAVIES GARETH [CA], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0065] , [0073] , [0172] *; | [A]WO2015019132 (BAYLIS MEDICAL CO INC [CA]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0104] - [0106] *; | [A]US2017266433 (DANIELS DAVID [US], et al) [A] 1* paragraphs [0040] - [0041] - [0060] * | International search | [YA]US2004133113 (KRISHNAN SUBRAMANIAM C [US]) [Y] 1-32 * See paragraphs [0007], [0056], [0065], [0066], [0081] and claims 1, 4, 8. * [A] 65-75,78; | [Y]US2015157353 (LENKER JAY A [US], et al) [Y] 21-32 * See claim 1. *; | [Y]WO2017042743 (BAYLIS MEDICAL CO INC [CA], et al) [Y] 32 * See paragraph [0014]. *; | [Y]US2017172653 (URBANSKI JOHN PAUL [CA], et al) [Y] 1-32 * See paragraph [0058] and claim 53. *; | [A]JP6301926B (UNIV. OF IOWA RESEARCH FOUNDATION) [A] 1-32, 65-75, 78* See paragraphs [0011]-[0021] and claim 1. * | by applicant | US2014228841 | WO2015019132 | US2017266433 |