EP3791181 - IMMUNE AGE AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.02.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.11.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | 05.07.2024 | First examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Technion Research & Development Foundation Limited Senate House Technion City Haifa 3200004 / IL | [2021/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN-ORR, Shai S. 54 Hanassi Street 3464316 Haifa / IL | 02 /
PICKMAN, Yishai Menachem 5 Katsenelson Street 7122607 Lod / IL | 03 /
ALPERT, Ayelet 136/26 Kiryat Ha'technion 3200000 Haifa / IL | [2021/11] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2021/11] | Application number, filing date | 19800760.1 | 07.05.2019 | [2021/11] | WO2019IL50523 | Priority number, date | US201862667698P | 07.05.2018 Original published format: US 201862667698 P | [2021/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019215740 | Date: | 14.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3791181 | Date: | 17.03.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 14.11.2019 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/50, C12Q1/68, G01N33/569 | [2022/08] | CPC: |
G01N33/56972 (EP);
G16H50/30 (US);
G01N33/6803 (US);
G16B50/30 (US);
G16H10/60 (US);
G01N2800/24 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2021/11] | G01N33/50, C12Q1/68 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/11] | Title | German: | IMMUNALTER UND SEINE VERWENDUNG | [2021/11] | English: | IMMUNE AGE AND USE THEREOF | [2021/11] | French: | ÂGE IMMUNOLOGIQUE ET UTILISATION ASSOCIÉE | [2021/11] | Entry into regional phase | 04.12.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Search fee paid | 04.12.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.12.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.12.2020 | Examination requested [2021/11] | 11.08.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.05.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2012021414 (SHEN-ORR SHAI S [US], et al); | International search | [X]WO2007145333 (UNIV TOKYO MEDICAL & DENTAL [JP], et al) [X] 1-27 * examples, claims *; | [X] - HIROKAWA, KATSUIKU et al., "Assessment of age-related decline of immunological function and possible methods for immunological restoration in elderly", Handbook of Immunosenescence: Basic Understanding and Clinical Implications, (20171208), pages 1 - 27, URL: https://link.springer.com/referenceworkentry/10.1007%2F978-3-319-64597-1_73-1, XP055651756 [X] 1-27 * abstract, pages 4-10 * | [XP] - ALPERT, AYELET et al., "A clinically meaningful metric of immune age derived from high- dimensional longitudinal monitoring", Nature medicine, (20190306), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 487 - 495, XP036722155 [XP] 1-27 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41591-019-0381-y |